Hubbert v. Attala County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Robert Shane Hubbert
Defendant: Sheriff Tim Nail, Deputy Sheriff Darrin Fleming, Deputy Sheriff Nicholas Cox, Attala County Jailors John Does 1-3 and Attala County, Mississippi
Case Number: 4:2020cv00203
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail (Griffith, Mary)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail. (Griffith, Daniel)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail (Griffith, Daniel)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Ray Hill, III on behalf of Robert Shane Hubbert Darrin Fleming served on 11/25/2020. (Hill, Sidney)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Ray Hill, III on behalf of Robert Shane Hubbert Nicholas Cox served on 11/25/2020. (Hill, Sidney)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Ray Hill, III on behalf of Robert Shane Hubbert Tim Nail served on 11/24/2020. (Hill, Sidney)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Ray Hill, III on behalf of Robert Shane Hubbert Attala County, Mississippi served on 11/24/2020. (Hill, Sidney)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1877749, filed by Robert Shane Hubbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
November 20, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbert v. Attala County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Tim Nail
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Darrin Fleming
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Nicholas Cox
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attala County Jailors John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attala County, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Shane Hubbert
Represented By: Sidney Ray Hill, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?