Malouf-Carr, L.P. v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Malouf-Carr, L.P.
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00030
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Zurich American Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/2/2021. (Currie, Edward)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to Zurich American Insurance Company, emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Zurich American Insurance Company, Jury Demand, filed by Malouf-Carr, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Aug. 24, 2020 Email from D.Barker, #3 Exhibit C - Dec. 23, 2020 Letter from D.Barker, #4 Exhibit D - Feb. 16, 2021 Letter to D.Barker, #5 Exhibit E - Feb. 25, 2021 Letter from D.Barker, #6 Exhibit F - Nov. 4, 2020 Letter to D.Barker) (Margolis, Alicia)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/19/2021. (jwr)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alicia Kate Margolis on behalf of Malouf-Carr, L.P. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 3/9/2021. (Margolis, Alicia)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Zurich American Insurance Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1917771, filed by Malouf-Carr, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 8/24/20 Email from D. Barker, #3 Exhibit C - 12/23/20 Denial of Coverage, #4 Exhibit D - 2/16/21 Letter to Zurich re Denial, #5 Exhibit E - Feb 15, 2021 Letter from D. Barker, #6 Exhibit F - 11/4/20 Letter to D. Barker, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
March 9, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malouf-Carr, L.P. v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malouf-Carr, L.P.
Represented By: Alicia Kate Margolis
Represented By: John Alexander Purvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?