Wilson v. Seagog et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Wilson
Defendant: Miranda Seagog and Medical Doctor Scott
Case Number: 4:2021cv00090
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #10 Order Spears Hearing. (cb)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cb)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 11/18/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/17/21. (cb)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/17/21. (cb)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. Document submitted electronically. (cb) Modified on 8/17/2021 (cb).
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 DECLINATION to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. District Judge Michael P. Mills no longer assigned to the case. Document submitted electronically. (cb) Modified on 8/17/2021 (cb).
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Complaint. (cb)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 9/3/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/3/21. (cb)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frederick Wilson. (cb)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, filed by Frederick Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (cb) Modified on 8/3/2021 (cb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Seagog et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miranda Seagog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Doctor Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?