Carroll v. State of Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Wiley Zachary Carroll
Defendant: State of Mississippi, Mississippi Dept. of Corrections and Cain Burrell
Case Number: 4:2021cv00106
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Debra M Brown
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/8/21. (cb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 DECLINATION to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. District Judge Debra M. Brown no longer assigned to the case. (cb) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/8/2021) (cb).
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Pro Se Address by Wiley Zachary Carroll. (cb)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 9/23/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/24/21. (cb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (cb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wiley Zachary Carroll. Document submitted electronically. (cb) Modified on 8/24/2021 (cb).
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, filed by Wiley Zachary Carroll. Document submitted electronically. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. State of Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wiley Zachary Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cain Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?