McCaley v. Miss Department of Corrections
Petitioner: Cordellra McCaley
Respondent: Miss Department of Corrections
Case Number: 4:2021cv00108
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Miss Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Indictment), #2 Exhibit B (Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty), #3 Exhibit C (Transcript of Guilty Plea and Sentencing), #4 Exhibit D (Sentencing Judgment)) (Owens, Jerrolyn) Modified on 10/22/2021 (tab).
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order GRANTING re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis and DIRECTING State to Respond. Document electronically submitted. (cb)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Order, Set Deadlines, Terminate Motions Acknowledgment filed by Miss Department of Corrections. (Owens, Jerrolyn)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis and DIRECTING State to Respond filed by Cordellra McCaley. Miss Department of Corrections answer due 11/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/25/21. (cb)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cordellra McCaley. Document electronically submitted. (cb) Modified on 8/25/2021 (cb).
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Carroll County) filed by Cordellra McCaley. Document electronically submitted. (cb) Modified on 8/25/2021 (cb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCaley v. Miss Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cordellra McCaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Miss Department of Corrections
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?