Reed et al v. Pitts Farms Partnership
Plaintiff: Wesley Reed, Gregory Strong, Richard Strong, Andrew Johnson, Stacy Griffin and James Simpson
Defendant: Pitts Farms Partnership
Case Number: 4:2021cv00113
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
2 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pitts Farms Partnership answer due 11/15/2021. No further order will be entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/22/21. No document attached. (def)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Pitts Farms Partnership. (Threadgill, Timothy)
October 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Scott Schell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schell, Gregory)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pitts Farms Partnership answer due 10/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/20/21. (def)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melia Amal Bouhabib on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bouhabib, Melia) (Main Document 9 replaced with flattened pdf version of same on 10/20/2021) (jla). Modified on 10/20/2021 (jla).
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Pitts Farms Partnership. (Threadgill, Timothy)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 #4 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Melia Amal Bouhabib and Gregory Scott admitted as counsel for the plaintiffs. Granting #5 #6 Motions to waive phv fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/5/21. (def) Modified on 10/5/2021 (jla).
October 4, 2021 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden no longer assigned to the case. (jla)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Waive Pro Hac Vice Fees re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Gregory Scott Schell, by Stacy Griffin, Andrew Johnson, Wesley Reed, James Simpson, Gregory Strong, Richard Strong. (McDuff, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Waive Pro Hac Vice Fees re #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Melia Amal Bouhabib, by Stacy Griffin, Andrew Johnson, Wesley Reed, James Simpson, Gregory Strong, Richard Strong. (McDuff, Robert)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Gregory Scott Schell, by Stacy Griffin, Andrew Johnson, Wesley Reed, James Simpson, Gregory Strong, Richard Strong. (jwr)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Melia Amal Bouhabib, by Stacy Griffin, Andrew Johnson, Wesley Reed, James Simpson, Gregory Strong, Richard Strong. (jwr)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pitts Farms Partnership; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1996223, filed by Gregory Strong, Wesley Reed, Richard Strong, James Simpson, Andrew Johnson, Stacy Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
September 8, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed et al v. Pitts Farms Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Reed
Represented By: Joseph Reilly Morse
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Gregory Scott Schell
Represented By: Melia Amal Bouhabib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Strong
Represented By: Joseph Reilly Morse
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Gregory Scott Schell
Represented By: Melia Amal Bouhabib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Strong
Represented By: Joseph Reilly Morse
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Gregory Scott Schell
Represented By: Melia Amal Bouhabib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Reilly Morse
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Gregory Scott Schell
Represented By: Melia Amal Bouhabib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Griffin
Represented By: Joseph Reilly Morse
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Gregory Scott Schell
Represented By: Melia Amal Bouhabib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Simpson
Represented By: Joseph Reilly Morse
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Gregory Scott Schell
Represented By: Melia Amal Bouhabib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pitts Farms Partnership
Represented By: Timothy M. Threadgill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?