Provine Helicopter Service, Inc. v. Rolls-Royce Corporation
Plaintiff: Provine Helicopter Service, Inc.
Defendant: Rolls-Royce Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv00139
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Rolls-Royce Corporation answer due 1/15/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/7/21. (jla)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (McCraney, W.)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint by Provine Helicopter Service, Inc.. (McCraney, W.) Modified on 12/7/2021 (jla).
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Rolls-Royce Corporation (jla)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by W. Thomas McCraney, III on behalf of Provine Helicopter Service, Inc. Rolls-Royce Corporation served on 11/5/2021. (McCraney, W.)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rolls-Royce Corporation, Jury Demand, filed by Provine Helicopter Service, Inc.. (McCraney, W.)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Rolls-Royce Corporation. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2017334, filed by Provine Helicopter Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
October 25, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provine Helicopter Service, Inc. v. Rolls-Royce Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provine Helicopter Service, Inc.
Represented By: W. Thomas McCraney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls-Royce Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?