State Farm Fire and Casualty Company as Subrogee of Earl Hall v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company as Subrogee of Earl Hall
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation and Bestway Rentals, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00012
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Whirlpool Corporation answer due 4/8/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/1/22. (jla)
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Whirlpool Corporation. (Strubel, J.) Modified on 3/1/2022 (jla).
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Whirlpool Corporation (jla)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Bestway Rentals, Inc.'s answer is now due 4/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/11/2022. (bbf)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint UNOPPOSED by Bestway Rentals, Inc.. (Scott, Shea)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Everet Brouillette on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company as Subrogee of Earl Hall Whirlpool Corporation served on 1/20/2022. (Brouillette, James)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Everet Brouillette on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company as Subrogee of Earl Hall Bestway Rentals, Inc. served on 1/20/2022. (Brouillette, James)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2048429, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company as Subrogee of Earl Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
January 14, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company as Subrogee of Earl Hall v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company as Subrogee of Earl Hall
Represented By: James Everet Brouillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: J. Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestway Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Shea Stewart Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?