White et al v. State Board of Election Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Dyamone White, Derrick Simmons, Ty Pinkins and Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell
Defendant: State Board of Election Commissioners, Tate Reeves, Lynn Fitch and Michael Watson
Case Number: 4:2022cv00062
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Sharion Aycock for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 6/21/22. (jla)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 7/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/17/2022. (irw)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lynn Fitch, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson. (Shannon, Rex)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael B. Wallace on behalf of All Defendants (Wallace, Michael)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Sophia Lin Lakin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/13/22. (jla)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Sophia Lin Lakin,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2106121) by Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service) (Tom, Joshua)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Liza Freedman Weisberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weisberg, Liza)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Vara Lyons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/31/22. (jla)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Vara Lyons,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2101419) by Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service) (Tom, Joshua)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Liza Weisberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/27/2022. (jla)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Jia Yan on behalf of Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White (Yan, Patricia)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Darlene Johnson (jla)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 EXHIBIT re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Liza Weisberg ; Attorney Liza Weisberg,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2089706) . (Morgan, Jade)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #30 Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process; disregard entry - filed in wrong case. (jla)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samantha Osaki on behalf of Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White (Osaki, Samantha)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac M. Rethy on behalf of Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White (Rethy, Isaac)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan K. Youngwood on behalf of Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White (Youngwood, Jonathan)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley E. Heard on behalf of Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White (Heard, Bradley)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac M. Rethy on behalf of Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White (Rethy, Isaac)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan K. Youngwood on behalf of Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White (Youngwood, Jonathan)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #24 Notice of Attorney Appearance; Attorney to include signature of local counsel on all filings as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(d)3. Attorney to refile with local counsel signature. (jla)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #23 Notice of Attorney Appearance; Attorney to include signature of local counsel on all filings as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(d)3. Attorney to refile with local counsel signature. (jla)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Patricia Yan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/12/22. (jla)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' shall have until and including Thursday, June 16, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/12/2022. (bbf)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (unopposed motion) by Lynn Fitch, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson. (Shannon, Rex)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley E. Heard on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Heard, Bradley)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ari J. Savitzky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Savitzky, Ari)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Jon Youngwood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/11/22. (jla)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Ari Savitzky. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/11/22. (jla)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Samantha Osaki. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/11/22. (jla)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Isaac Rethy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/11/22. (jla)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jon Youngwood,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2094206) by Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service, #2 Exhibit B List of Bar Admissions) (Tom, Joshua)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Ari Savitzky,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2094200) by Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service) (Tom, Joshua)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Patricia Yan,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2094196) by Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service) (Tom, Joshua)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Samantha Osaki,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2094192) by Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service) (Tom, Joshua)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Isaac Rethy,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2093779) by Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Service) (Tom, Joshua)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Bradley E. Heard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/6/22. (jla)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bradley E. Heard ; Attorney Bradley E. Heard,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2089679) . (Morgan, Jade)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lakyn Celeste Collier on behalf of Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White, Ty Pinkins, Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell All Defendants. (Collier, Lakyn)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Michael P. Mills recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 5/3/22. (jla)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bradley E. Heard ; Please file a certificate of good standing from District of Columbia state licensing authority by using the civil event "Exhibits to Other Documents" and linking to original motion. (jla)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Liza Weisberg; Please file a certificate of good standing from Georgia and New Jersey state licensing authority by using the civil event "Exhibits to Other Documents" and linking to original motion. (jla)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Liza Weisberg ; Attorney Liza Weisberg,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2089706) by Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White. (Morgan, Jade)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bradley E. Heard ; Attorney Bradley E. Heard,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2089679) by Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell, Ty Pinkins, Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White. (Morgan, Jade)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lynn Fitch, Tate Reeves, State Board of Election Commissioners, Michael Watson; forwarded to Attorney for service. (jla)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2087227, filed by Derrick Simmons, Dyamone White, Ty Pinkins, Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. State Board of Election Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyamone White
Represented By: Jade O. Morgan
Represented By: Joshua Fiyenn Tom
Represented By: Lakyn Celeste Collier
Represented By: Leslie Faith Jones
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky
Represented By: Bradley E. Heard
Represented By: Isaac M. Rethy
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Liza Freedman Weisberg
Represented By: Patricia Jia Yan
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Vara Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Simmons
Represented By: Jade O. Morgan
Represented By: Joshua Fiyenn Tom
Represented By: Lakyn Celeste Collier
Represented By: Leslie Faith Jones
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky
Represented By: Bradley E. Heard
Represented By: Isaac M. Rethy
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Liza Freedman Weisberg
Represented By: Patricia Jia Yan
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Vara Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ty Pinkins
Represented By: Jade O. Morgan
Represented By: Joshua Fiyenn Tom
Represented By: Lakyn Celeste Collier
Represented By: Leslie Faith Jones
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky
Represented By: Bradley E. Heard
Represented By: Isaac M. Rethy
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Liza Freedman Weisberg
Represented By: Patricia Jia Yan
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Vara Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Olivia Straught Harvey-Burwell
Represented By: Jade O. Morgan
Represented By: Joshua Fiyenn Tom
Represented By: Lakyn Celeste Collier
Represented By: Leslie Faith Jones
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky
Represented By: Bradley E. Heard
Represented By: Isaac M. Rethy
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Liza Freedman Weisberg
Represented By: Patricia Jia Yan
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Vara Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Board of Election Commissioners
Represented By: Michael B. Wallace
Represented By: Rex Morris Shannon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Reeves
Represented By: Michael B. Wallace
Represented By: Rex Morris Shannon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Fitch
Represented By: Michael B. Wallace
Represented By: Rex Morris Shannon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Watson
Represented By: Michael B. Wallace
Represented By: Rex Morris Shannon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?