Vantree et al v. Progressive Gulf Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Betty Vantree and Cynthia Rayborn
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company and Mountain Laurel Assurance Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv00070
Filed: May 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Filing 82 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Cynthia Rayborn, Betty Vantree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Costello Minute Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Shamis, Andrew)
November 22, 2023 Filing 81 NOTICE by La'Toyia Jenessa Slay on behalf of Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company re #77 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, #72 MOTION to Certify Class of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Kroeger decision) (Slay, La'Toyia)
November 21, 2023 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/21/2023. (irw)
November 20, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/21/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (nih)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying #73 MOTION to RESTRICT document from public access; denying #76 MOTION to RESTRICT document from public access. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 11/14/23. (jla)
November 8, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #76 MOTION to RESTRICT document from public access; Attorney to email proposed order to chambers as required by Section 5(B) of the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. (jla)
November 6, 2023 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Walker Report, #2 Exhibit B: Vantree Dep. Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit C: Vantree Dep. Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit D: Kroell Dep. Ex. 5, #5 Exhibit E: Kroell Dep. Tr., #6 Exhibit F: Bogus Dep. Tr., #7 Exhibit G: Kroell Dep. Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit H: Vantree Dep. Tr., #9 Exhibit I: Rayborn Dep. Ex. 2, #10 Exhibit J: Rayborn Dep. Ex. 3, #11 Exhibit K: Rayborn Dep. Ex. 11, #12 Exhibit L: Rayborn Dep. Ex. 12, #13 Exhibit M: Rayborn Dep. Ex. 13, #14 Exhibit N: Rayborn Dep. Ex. 5, #15 Exhibit O: Rayborn Dep. Tr., #16 Exhibit P: Lacey Volino Dep. Tr., #17 Exhibit Q: Declaration of John Scheuren, #18 Exhibit R: Kuntz Dep. Tr., #19 Exhibit S: Holcomb Dep. Tr., #20 Exhibit T: Felix Bartee Dep. Tr., #21 Exhibit U: Felix Costello Dep. Tr., #22 Exhibit V: Felix Vantree Dep. Tr., #23 Exhibit W: Spizzirri Report, #24 Exhibit X: Felix Bartee Dep. Ex. 10, #25 Exhibit Y: Merritt Costello Dep. Tr., #26 Exhibit Z: Ryan Dep. Tr., #27 Exhibit AA: Kinney Report, #28 Exhibit BB: Merritt Volino Dep. Tr., #29 Exhibit CC: Merritt Schroeder Dep. Tr., #30 Exhibit DD: Felix Drummond Dep. Tr., #31 Exhibit EE: Merritt Drummond Dep. Tr., #32 Exhibit FF: Merritt Vantree Dep. Tr., #33 Exhibit GG: Declaration of Hover, #34 Exhibit HH: Lacey Costello Dep. Tr., #35 Exhibit II: Lacey Vantree Dep. Tr., #36 Exhibit JJ: Kroell Decl.) (Cashdan, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2023 Filing 76 MOTION to RESTRICT document from public access. Filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Cashdan, Jeffrey)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Logan R. Hobson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/23/23. (jla)
October 23, 2023 Filing 74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Logan R. Hobson,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2311024) by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Slay, La'Toyia)
October 6, 2023 Filing 73 MOTION to RESTRICT document from public access. Filed Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification and supporting documents by Cynthia Rayborn, Betty Vantree. (Phillips, Jacob)
October 6, 2023 Filing 72 MOTION to Certify Class by Cynthia Rayborn, Betty Vantree. (Phillips, Jacob)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions. The parties shall have until 12/1/2023 to file Daubert motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/3/2023. (bbf)
October 2, 2023 Filing 70 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for filing Daubert Motions by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Slay, La'Toyia)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Plaintiffs shall have until 12/1/2023 to file their Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/25/2023. (bbf)
September 25, 2023 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Cynthia Rayborn, Betty Vantree. (Shamis, Andrew)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Jacob L. Phillips. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/22/23. (jla)
September 22, 2023 Filing 66 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jacob L. Phillips,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2300627) by Betty Vantree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Flanagan, Thomas)
August 18, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Shamis on behalf of Cynthia Rayborn, Betty Vantree (Shamis, Andrew)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Andrew J. Shamis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/18/2023. (jwr)
August 17, 2023 Filing 63 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Andrew J. Shamis, by Betty Vantree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #7 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Flanagan, Thomas)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Erin M. Munger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/10/2023. (jwr)
July 7, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Erin M. Munger,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2265864) by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Slay, La'Toyia)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Andrew J. Shamis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/5/2023. (jtm)
June 14, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Chagas Gold on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gold, Christopher)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Chris Gold. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/14/23. (jla)
June 14, 2023 Filing 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Chris Gold,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2256971) by Betty Vantree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Flanagan, Thomas)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED ORDER granting #44 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time re: Expert Deadlines filed by Cynthia Rayborn, Betty Vantree Defendants Designation of Experts due by 9/26/2023; Expert Depositions permitted through 10/27/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/7/23. (jla)
June 5, 2023 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/5/2023. (irw)
June 1, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference RESET for 6/5/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
May 30, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/2/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (nih)
May 2, 2023 Filing 52 EXHIBIT re #39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Andrew J. Shamis,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2221603) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Flanagan, Thomas)
April 28, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edwin Eliu Elliott on behalf of Cynthia Rayborn, Betty Vantree (Elliott, Edwin)
April 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #51 Notice of Attorney Appearance: Attorney to include signature of local counsel on all filings as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(d)3. Attorney to refile with local counsel signature. (jla)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Daniel S. Sanders, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 04/12/2023. (nih)
April 12, 2023 Filing 49 EXHIBIT re #46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Daniel S. Sanders III,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2227927) . (Slay, La'Toyia)
April 12, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Daniel S. Sanders III; Pursuant to Local Rule 83, Form 6 Application Pro Hac Vice required to be used when filing pro hac vice, attorney directed to file 'Exhibit to Other Documents' using application and link to original motion. (jla)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Edwin Eliu Elliott. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 04/10/2023. (nih)
April 10, 2023 Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Edwin Eliu Elliott, (Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2228475) by Betty Vantree, Cynthia Rayborn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Flanagan, Thomas) Modified on 4/10/2023 (jla).
April 6, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Daniel S. Sanders III,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2227927) by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Daniel S. Sanders III) (Slay, La'Toyia)
April 6, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Daniel S. Sanders III: Pursuant to Local Rule 83, Form 6 Application Pro Hac Vice required to be used when filing pro hac vice, attorney directed to file 'Exhibit to Other Documents' using application and link to original motion. (jla)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Joint Motion for Extension of Expert-Related Deadlines. Plaintiffs' Designation of Experts due by 7/12/2023. Defendants' Designation of Experts due by 9/22/2023. Daubert Motions due by 11/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/4/2023. (bbf)
April 3, 2023 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time re: Expert Deadlines by Cynthia Rayborn, Betty Vantree. (Judkins, Amy) Modified on 4/4/2023 (jla).
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATED ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY OF ESI granting #41 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/3/2023. (bbf)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting #40 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/3/2023. (bbf)
March 22, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (UNOPPOSED) by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of ESI) (Slay, La'Toyia)
March 22, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION for Protective Order - UNOPPOSED MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality Order by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Confidentiality Order) (Slay, La'Toyia)
March 22, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Andrew J. Shamis,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2221603) by Betty Vantree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Flanagan, Thomas)
March 22, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #40 MOTION for Protective Order; #41 MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information: Attorney to email proposed orders to chambers as required by Section 5(B) of the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. (jwr)
March 22, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Andrew J. Shamis: Attorney to provide a certificate of good standing from each licensing authority where admitted to practice law as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(d)(4). Please use the civil event "Exhibits to Other Documents" and link to the original motion. (jwr)
November 7, 2022 Filing 38 CORPORATE STATEMENT - AMENDED. (Slay, La'Toyia)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 8/7/2023. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/21/2022. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 4/6/2023. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 5/5/2023. Motions due by 9/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/6/2022. (irw)
October 6, 2022 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/6/2022. (irw)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Zachary A. McEntyre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/05/2022. (nih)
October 4, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Zachary A. McEntyre,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2151351) by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Slay, La'Toyia)
September 29, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Case Management Conference RESET for 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (bbf)
September 26, 2022 Filing 32 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Defendants Progressive Gulf Insurance Company and Mountain Laurel Assurance Company. (Slay, La'Toyia)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 9/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/1/2022. (irw)
August 31, 2022 Filing 30 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Slay, La'Toyia)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 08/22/2022. (nih)
August 19, 2022 Filing 28 EXHIBIT re #17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130350) Exhibit A: Georgia State Bar Certificate of Good Standing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B: Illinois State Bar Certificate of Good Standing) (Spicer, Adam)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Allison Hill White. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 08/18/2022. (nih)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Julia C. Barrett.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 08/18/2022. (nih)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney James Matthew Brigman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 08/18/2022. (nih)
August 17, 2022 Filing 24 EXHIBIT re #18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Allison Hill White,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130352) Exhibit A: Georgia State Bar Certificate of Good Standing. (Spicer, Adam)
August 17, 2022 Filing 23 EXHIBIT re #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney James Matthew Brigman,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130910) Exhibit A: Georgia State Bar Certificate of Good Standing. (Spicer, Adam)
August 17, 2022 Filing 22 EXHIBIT re #20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Julia C. Barrett,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130903) Exhibit A: Georgia State Bar Certificate of Good Standing. (Spicer, Adam)
August 17, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #19 Exhibits to Other Document. Attorney is directed to refile exhibit with correct pdf attached. All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion. (cb)
August 17, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Julia C. Barrett,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130903). Attorney is directed to refile Exhibit A with correct pdf attached. Please file a certificate of good standing from Georgia state licensing authority by using the civil event "Exhibits to Other Documents" and linking to original motion. (cb)
August 17, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney James Matthew Brigman,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130910). Attorney is directed to refile Exhibit A with correct pdf attached. Please file a certificate of good standing from Georgia state licensing authority by using the civil event "Exhibits to Other Documents" and linking to original motion. (cb)
August 16, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney James Matthew Brigman,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130910) by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Georgia State Bar Certificate of Good Standing) (Spicer, Adam)
August 16, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Julia C. Barrett,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130903) by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Georgia State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B: Texas State Bar Certificate of Good Standing) (Spicer, Adam)
August 16, 2022 Filing 19 EXHIBIT re Notice of Correction,, A: Georgia State Bar Certificate of Good Standing for Allison Hill White. (Spicer, Adam)
August 16, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130350). Pursuant to Local Rule 83, Form 6 Application Pro Hac Vice required tobe used when filing pro hac vice, attorney directed to file 'Exhibit to OtherDocuments' using application and link to original motion. Also, Attorney to provide a certificate of good standing from each licensing authority where admitted to practice law as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(d)(4). (cb)
August 16, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Allison Hill White,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130352). Pursuant to Local Rule 83, Form 6 Application Pro Hac Vice required tobe used when filing pro hac vice, attorney directed to file 'Exhibit to OtherDocuments' using application and link to original motion. Also, Attorney to provide a certificate of good standing from each licensing authority where admitted to practice law as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(d)(4). (cb)
August 15, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Allison Hill White,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130352) by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Spicer, Adam)
August 15, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130350) by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Spicer, Adam)
August 9, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam J. Spicer on behalf of Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Spicer, Adam)
August 5, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Progressive Gulf Insurance Company and Mountain Laurel Assurance Company (jla)
August 5, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #15 Clerk's Notice of Past Due Answer - DISREGARD Notice, entered in error. (jla)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edwin Lee Lowther, III; Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 08/02/2022. (nih)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph Henry Bates, III; Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 08/02/2022. (nih)
August 1, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mountain Laurel Assurance Company answer due 8/31/2022; Progressive Gulf Insurance Company answer due 8/31/2022; see #9 ORDER. (jla)
August 1, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Edwin Lee Lowther, III, by Betty Vantree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Flanagan, Thomas)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Joseph Henry Bates, III,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2125185) by Betty Vantree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Flanagan, Thomas)
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Betty Vantree, Cynthia Rayborn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Judkins, Amy)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Set Schedule for Filing of Amended Complaint and Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/1/22. (jla)
July 28, 2022 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Set Schedule for Filing of Amended Complaint & Response by Betty Vantree. (Judkins, Amy)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. By agreement of the parties, Defendants shall have up to and including July 29, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/8/2022. (bbf)
July 8, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mountain Laurel Assurance Company answer due 7/29/2022; Progressive Gulf Insurance Company answer due 7/29/2022. (bbf)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Amy Judkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/30/22. (jla)
June 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Amy L. Judkins re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Betty Vantree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Flanagan, Thomas)
June 23, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Amy L. Judkins; Motion does not include signature page; Attorney directed to file complete motion using the civil event Exhibits to Other Document and linking to the original motion. (jla)
June 22, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Amy L. Judkins,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2110821) by Betty Vantree. (Flanagan, Thomas)
June 22, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Amy L. Judkins; Attorney to refile motion with the exhibit(s) separately identified with an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). (jla)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Progressive Gulf Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/16/2022. (Flanagan, Thomas)
May 13, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
May 13, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2095296, filed by Betty Vantree, Cynthia Rayborn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vantree et al v. Progressive Gulf Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Vantree
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan, Jr.
Represented By: Amy L. Judkins
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Edwin Eliu Elliott
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Jacob L. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Rayborn
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan, Jr.
Represented By: Amy L. Judkins
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Edwin Eliu Elliott
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Jacob L. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam J. Spicer
Represented By: Allison Hill White
Represented By: James Matthew Brigman
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Julia C. Barrett
Represented By: La'Toyia Jenessa Slay
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Daniel S. Sanders, III
Represented By: Erin Munger
Represented By: Logan R. Hobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Laurel Assurance Company
Represented By: Adam J. Spicer
Represented By: Allison Hill White
Represented By: James Matthew Brigman
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Julia C. Barrett
Represented By: La'Toyia Jenessa Slay
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Daniel S. Sanders, III
Represented By: Erin Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?