Cobbins v. Chicot Irrigation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lekatin Cobbins
Defendant: Chicot Irrigation, Inc., Kentzevius Flowers and John and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2022cv00186
Filed: December 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/1/2023. (irw)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference RESET for 2/1/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (bbf)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/31/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (bbf) Modified on 1/27/2023 to correct time only (irw).
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE by F. Ewin Henson, III on behalf of Chicot Irrigation, Inc. Notice of Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum upon Sheriff Milton M. Gaston (Henson, F.) Modified on 1/27/2023 (jla).
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Kentzevius Flowers (jla)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosures by Raynetra L. Gustavis on behalf of Lekatin Cobbins. (Gustavis, Raynetra)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE by F. Ewin Henson, III on behalf of Chicot Irrigation, Inc. Rule 26(1)(a) Disclosures (Henson, F.) Modified on 1/22/2023 (jla).
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lekatin Cobbins . (Gustavis, Raynetra)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chicot Irrigation, Inc. . (Henson, F.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE as to Lekatin Cobbins: Effective December 1, 2022, F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event "Disclosure Statement" to file the required statement. (jwr)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2023 at 11:00 AM in before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Case Management Conference due no later than 1/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/9/23. (irw)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests by F. Ewin Henson, III on behalf of Chicot Irrigation, Inc. to Plaintiff. (Henson, F.)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Chicot Irrigation, Inc.. (Henson, F.)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 State Court Record - Removal. Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in the red docket text of Docket Entry #1 . (cb)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re Notice of Correction. Disregard entry. (cb)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Complaint, #2 State Court Complaint Summons, #3 State Court Complaint Summons) (Henson, F.)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Production by Raynetra L. Gustavis on behalf of Lekatin Cobbins to Defendant, Chicot Irrigation, Inc.. (Gustavis, Raynetra)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories by Raynetra L. Gustavis on behalf of Lekatin Cobbins to Defendant, Chicot Irrigation, Inc.. (Gustavis, Raynetra)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT . (Henson, F.)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lekatin Cobbins. (jla)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chicot Irrigation, Inc. from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 2022-0115CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2177902) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Chicot Irrigation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Bill of Information, #3 Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty, #4 Sentencing Order, #5 Correspondence, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Please take notice that a F.R.C.P. 7.1 disclosure statement has not been filed in this case. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required statement. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobbins v. Chicot Irrigation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lekatin Cobbins
Represented By: Darryl Moses Gibbs
Represented By: Raynetra L. Gustavis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicot Irrigation, Inc.
Represented By: F. Ewin Henson, III
Represented By: Glenn F. Beckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentzevius Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?