Hall v. BFI Waste Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Thomas Hall
Defendant: Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA and BFI Waste Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00060
Filed: March 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Trial: Non-Jury Trial set for 5/20/2024 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (lld)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Discovery due by 12/29/2023. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 8/18/2023. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 10/20/2023. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 11/17/2023. Motions due by 1/12/2024. Settlement Conference set for 11/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/25/2023. (jf)
May 25, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Mark C. Carlson on behalf of BFI Waste Services, LLC to Plaintiff. (Carlson, Mark)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #15 Motion for Jury Trial. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 5/24/2023. (jwr)
May 23, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Initial Disclosures by Mark C. Carlson on behalf of BFI Waste Services, LLC to Plaintiff. (Carlson, Mark)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Substitute Party. BFI Waste Services, LLC added. Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/22/2023. (jtm)
May 22, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re Notice of Correction; disregard notice - disclosure statement filed at #9 . (jla)
May 19, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Substitute Party by Christopher Thomas Hall. (Boone, Levi)
May 19, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Jury Trial by Christopher Thomas Hall. (Boone, Levi)
May 19, 2023 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Christopher Thomas Hall . (Boone, Levi)
May 19, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Pre-discovery Disclosures by Levi Boone, III on behalf of Christopher Thomas Hall to Defendant Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA. (Boone, Levi)
May 19, 2023 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 5/19/2023. Case Management Order to be entered. (jf)
May 17, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Mark C. Carlson on behalf of Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA to Plaintiff. (Carlson, Mark)
May 15, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE as to Christopher Thomas Hall; Effective December 1, 2022, F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2023 at 9:30 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 5/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/25/2023. (jf)
April 21, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by Mark C. Carlson on behalf of Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Amendment to Jurisdictional Basis for Diversity (Carlson, Mark)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 4/12/23. (jla)
April 12, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA. (Carlson, Mark)
April 6, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA. (Carlson, Mark)
April 5, 2023 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Court Docket, #2 Filing Fee, #3 Fee Bill, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Complaint, #6 Summons) (Carlson, Mark)
April 5, 2023 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Court Docket, #2 Filing Fee, #3 Fee Bill, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Complaint, #6 Summons) (MacNeill, John)
April 5, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 State Court Record - Removal: Document to be refiled using the login credentials of defense attorney. (jwr)
March 30, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA . (Carlson, Mark)
March 30, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA, filed by Christopher Thomas Hall. (jla)
March 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 2022-0442 CO. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2224997) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
March 30, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Effective December 1, 2022, F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
March 30, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. BFI Waste Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Thomas Hall
Represented By: Levi Boone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Services of Greenville-Leland DBA
Represented By: Mark C. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFI Waste Services, LLC
Represented By: Mark C. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?