Cline v. Walmart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Cline
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc., Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Supercenter #716, John Doe(s) 1-10 and John Doe Company(ies) 1-10
Case Number: 4:2023cv00071
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/5/2023. (irw)
June 5, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial-Settlement Conference set for 7/1/2024 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than 6/20/2024. (irw)
June 5, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 7/29/2024 09:40 AM in Aberdeen Bankruptcy Courthouse - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (tjw)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2024 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 12/5/2023. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 7/19/2023. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 9/5/2023. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 10/5/2023. Motions due by 1/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/5/23. (irw)
June 5, 2023 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 6/5/2023. (irw)
June 1, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories Propounded to Defendant; and Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production Documents Propounded to Defendant by Kira D. Newson on behalf of Sarah Cline to Walmart Stores East, LP. (Newson, Kira)
June 1, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Information by Kira D. Newson on behalf of Sarah Cline to Walmart Stores East, LP. (Newson, Kira)
May 23, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Sarah Cline by Britt Virden on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP (Virden, Britt)
May 23, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Sarah Cline by Britt Virden on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP (Virden, Britt)
May 17, 2023 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sarah Cline . (Newson, Kira)
May 15, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE as to Sarah Cline: Effective December 1, 2022, F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss; Walmart Stores, Inc. and Walmart Supercenter #716 are terminated. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/12/23. (jla)
May 9, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Britt Virden on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff Sarah Cline. (Virden, Britt)
May 9, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Dcouments by Britt Virden on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff Sarah Cline. (Virden, Britt)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 5/22/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/8/23. (irw)
May 4, 2023 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" St Crt Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "2" St Crt Complaint, #3 Exhibit "3" Summons Walmart Stores Inc, #4 Exhibit "4" Summons Walmart Stores East, #5 Exhibit "5" Summons Walmart Supercenter, #6 Exhibit "6" Receipt of Notice of Removal) (Virden, Britt)
April 25, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Walmart Stores, Inc., Walmart Supercenter #716. (Virden, Britt)
April 25, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Stores, Inc., Walmart Supercenter #716. (Virden, Britt) Modified docket text to remove jury demand on 5/2/2023 (jla).
April 24, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
April 21, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Stores, Inc.. (jla)
April 21, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sarah Cline. (jla)
April 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Stores, Inc., Walmart Supercenter #716, Walmart Stores East, LP from Leflore County Circuit Court, case number 2023-0025-CICI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2234760) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Walmart Stores, Inc., Walmart Supercenter #716, Walmart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cline v. Walmart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Cline
Represented By: Kira D. Newson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Supercenter #716
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Company(ies) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?