Stewart v. CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Isaiah Stewart
Defendant: CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc., CNA National Warranty Corporation and Consumer Program Administrators, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00076
Filed: April 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1; Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 7/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/23/2023. (irw)
June 20, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc.. (Burgett, Ryan)
June 15, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Consumer Program Administrators, Inc.. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
June 14, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Consumer Program Administrators, Inc. (jla)
June 5, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc., Consumer Program Administrators, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by Isaiah Stewart. (Ware, Daniel)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/5/2023. (jtm)
June 2, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Isaiah Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint) (Ware, Daniel)
June 1, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint; Attorney to refile motion with the exhibit(s) separately identified with an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). (jla)
May 31, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Daniel D. Ware on behalf of Isaiah Stewart (Ware, Daniel)
May 26, 2023 Filing 7 DISREGARD ENTRY -- REFILED AT DOC 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint by Isaiah Stewart. (Ware, Daniel) Modified on 6/22/2023 (jla).
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time CNA National Warranty Corporation answer due 6/8/2023; CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc. answer due 6/5/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/5/23. (jla)
May 5, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by CNA National Warranty Corporation, CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc.. (Burgett, Ryan)
May 2, 2023 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 DKT #001 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 DKT #002 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 DKT #003 Summons to CarMax Issued, #4 Exhibit 4 DKT #004-Summons to CNA Issued, #5 Exhibit 5 DKT #005-Summons Returned Executed as to CarMax, #6 Exhibit 6 DKT #006-Summons Returned Executed as to CNA, #7 Exhibit 7 DKT #007-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Burgett, Ryan)
April 28, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc. . (Burgett, Ryan)
April 28, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against CNA National Warranty Corporation, CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc., filed by Isaiah Stewart. (jla)
April 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc. from County Court of Coahoma County, case number 14CO1:23-00030. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2238196) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit B - Index and State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - List of Counsel of Record, #4 Exhibit D - Consent to Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
April 28, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Stewart
Represented By: Daniel D. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CarMax Auto Superstores Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Allen Burgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA National Warranty Corporation
Represented By: Ryan Allen Burgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Program Administrators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?