Christion v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sakinal Christion
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Home Centers, Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2023cv00201
Filed: October 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court. Responses due by 1/12/2024. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 12/12/2023. (lld)
December 11, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Robinson, Benjamin)
December 4, 2023 Filing 14 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Payment of Filing Fee, #2 Exhibit 2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Issued to Bernadette, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons Issued to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons Issued to Lowe's Home Centers, Inc., #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons Issued to Lowe's of Mississippi, #8 Exhibit 8 - Plf's Motion for Enlargement of Time, #9 Exhibit 9 - Summons Returned Executed (Lowe's Home Centers, LLC), #10 Exhibit 10 - Summons Returned Executed (Lowe's Home Centers, Inc.), #11 Exhibit 11 - First Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit 12 - Summons Issued (Bernadette Wright)) (Robinson, Benjamin)
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE cancelling Case Management Conference re #6 Initial Order - Rule 16.1; #9 Order Staying Certain Proceedings. (irw)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY DIRECTED TO REFILE STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Robinson, Benjamin) Modified on 12/1/2023 (jwr).
December 1, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #12 State Court Record - Removal: Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in the red docket text of Docket Entry #1 . (jwr)
November 30, 2023 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal: Attorney to file State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b). (jla)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sakinal Christion. (Carter, Ottowa)
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sakinal Christion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" 04-22-2020 Lowe's Letter, #2 Exhibit "B" - Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit "C" - 04-11-2023 Counsel's Email, #4 Exhibit "D" - 05-08-2023 Circuit Clerk Letter, #5 Exhibit "E" - 05-16-2023 Counsel's Email, #6 Exhibit "F" - 05-18-2023 Sheriff's Letter, #7 Exhibit "G" 09-14-2023 Sheriff's Return) (Carter, Ottowa)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/28/23. (jla)
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Attorney to refile motion in accordance with L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2)(B) as motions may not exceed four pages and may not contain legal argument or citations to case law or other secondary authority. (lgm)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY DIRECTED TO REFILE MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sakinal Christion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" 04-22-2020 Lowe's Letter, #2 Exhibit "B" - Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit "C" - 04-11-2023 Counsel's Email, #4 Exhibit "D" - 05-08-2023 Circuit Clerk Letter, #5 Exhibit "E" - 05-16-2023 Counsel's Email, #6 Exhibit "F" - 05-18-2023 Sheriff's Letter, #7 Exhibit "G" 09-14-2023 Sheriff's Return) (Carter, Ottowa) Modified on 11/28/2023 (lgm).
November 22, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal; Attorney to file State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b). (jla)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC's Initial Disclosures by Benjamin Lyle Robinson on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC to Plaintiff. (Robinson, Benjamin)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 11/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/3/23. (irw)
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Robinson, Benjamin)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caylan Devine Dunnells on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Dunnells, Caylan)
October 27, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC . (Robinson, Benjamin)
October 27, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Lowe's Home Centers, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, filed by Sakinal Christion. (jla)
October 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 76CI1:22-cv-95. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2313992) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record) (jla)
October 27, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE; F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
October 27, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christion v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sakinal Christion
Represented By: Ottowa E. Carter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Lyle Robinson
Represented By: Caylan Devine Dunnells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Lyle Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?