Thomas v. Shulkin et al

Plaintiff: Dietrich Thomas
Defendant: Bryan Matthews, U.S. Attorney General, Lowell Hayes, Dorian Jean, Department of Justice United States of America, Anthony Dawson, Omar Stanton, U.S. Attorney and David Shulkin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00228
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #8 Motion to Amend/Correct complaint. The two-sentence motion refers to documents not before the Court, and states no facts for consideration by the Court to determine whether amendment is appropriate. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 28, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Dietrich Thomas (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; *RESTRICTED* granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on April 22, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dietrich Thomas (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(PKS)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Remark: Partial civil cover sheet by plaintiff to the complaint filed 4/8/19 received on this date. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (PKS)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring additional information re #2 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on April 11, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Application to Proceed IFP) (Joffe, Scherry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Remark: Notice of Assignment mailed to plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. (PKS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dietrich Thomas (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Dawson, Department of Justice United States of America, Lowell Hayes, Dorian Jean, Bryan Matthews, David Shulkin, Omar Stanton, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General filed by Dietrich Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Shulkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowell Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorian Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dietrich Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?