Hendrix et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Hendrix and William Hendrix
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, David James Insurance Agency, David James and John Does A-D
Case Number: 1:2021cv00253
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting as unopposed Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in support of their #8 Motion to Remand. Any Reply is now due on or before October 1, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on September 22, 2021. (ENW)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Patricia Hendrix, William Hendrix (Burkes, Jennifer)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Bergin, Patrick)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Parkinson Burkes on behalf of Patricia Hendrix, William Hendrix (Burkes, Jennifer)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting as unopposed Defendant Allstate Insurance Company's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' #8 Motion to Remand. Allstate's Response is now due on or before September 20, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on September 2, 2021. (ENW)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Allstate Insurance Company (Bergin, Patrick)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER staying discovery. Plaintiffs have filed a Motion to Remand #8 . The attorney conference, disclosure requirements, and all discovery are stayed pending the Court's ruling on the Motion to Remand. See L.U.Civ.P. 16(b)(1)(B). NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/24/21 (HM)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Patricia Hendrix, William Hendrix (Mestayer, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Patricia Hendrix, William Hendrix (Mestayer, Matthew)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by David James Insurance Agency, David James (Manor, Wade)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Insurance Company. (Bergin, Patrick)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 Joinder in Document by David James Insurance Agency, David James to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Manor, Wade)
July 28, 2021 Docket Annotation as to Doc #3. This document is not signed in compliance with the court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.D.1. which pertains to both civil and criminal pleadings. Attorney is directed to refile the document with an appropriate signature. Document #3 will be disregarded. (wld)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 State Court Record by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company Volumes 1 (Bergin, Patrick)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 (DISREGARD)Joinder in Document by David James Insurance Agency, David James to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Manor, Wade) Modified on 7/28/2021 (wld).
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Allstate Insurance Company (Bergin, Patrick)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Harrison County Circuit Court - First Judicial District, case number A2401-2021-170. Lower court jury demand. (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 4616399) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal, #4 Exhibit D - Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)
July 26, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to exhibits C and D of Notice of Removal. Attorney is advised that these documents are not considered a filed Consent or Answer, unless they are filed as standalone pleadings by attorney on the ECF system. (JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrix et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hendrix
Represented By: Matthew G. Mestayer
Represented By: Jennifer Parkinson Burkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hendrix
Represented By: Matthew G. Mestayer
Represented By: Jennifer Parkinson Burkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Timothy Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David James Insurance Agency
Represented By: Wade G. Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David James
Represented By: Wade G. Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A-D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?