PennyMac Loan Services, LLC v. SITCOMM Arbitration Association et al
Plaintiff: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Defendant: Mark Johnson, SITCOMM Arbitration Association, Ronnie Kahapea, Alaric Scott, Kirk Gibbs, Mark Moffett and Sandra Goulette
Interested Party: Eeon
Case Number: 2:2019cv00193
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #32 MOTION to Demurrer filed by Kirk Gibbs Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/7/2020 (lm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Demurrer by Kirk Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LDR)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying #25 Motion to Demurrer filed by Eeon; denying #26 Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Kirk Gibbs; denying #27 Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Eeon; striking #28 Answer to Complaint filed by Mark Moffett; and denying as moot #29 Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Mark Moffett. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/4/2020 (lm)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/4/2020. (lm)
February 3, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #28 #29 : This document is not signed in compliance with the court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.D.2. which pertains to both civil and criminal pleadings. (LDR)
February 3, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Mark Moffett. (LDR)
February 3, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Mark Moffett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LDR)
February 3, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Eeon. (LDR)
February 3, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Kirk Gibbs. (LDR)
February 3, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION To Demurrer by Eeon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LDR)
February 3, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Kirk Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LDR)
January 31, 2020 Filing 23 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT against defendants Sandra Goulette, Mark Moffett,and SITCOMM Arbitration Association. (ASJ)
January 31, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Entry of Default re Mark Moffett and Supporting Affidavit by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Chang - PHV, Cheryl)
January 31, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Entry of Default re Sandra Goulette and Supporting Affidavit by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Chang - PHV, Cheryl)
January 31, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Entry of Default re Sitcomm Arbitration Association and Supporting Affidavit by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Chang - PHV, Cheryl)
January 28, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Ronnie Kahapea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3D - UCC Financing Statement, #2 Envelope)(LDR)
January 14, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. SITCOMM Arbitration Association served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Chang - PHV, Cheryl)
January 14, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. Ronnie Kahapea served on 12/21/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Chang - PHV, Cheryl)
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. Mark Johnson served on 12/21/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Chang - PHV, Cheryl)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #10 Motion for Discovery; denying #10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/9/2020. (lm)
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. Mark Moffett served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Powers, Harris)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. Sandra Goulette served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Powers, Harris)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mark Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(LDR)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT, COUNTERCLAIM against PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed by Ronnie Kahapea.(LDR)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to Dismiss, by Ronnie Kahapea. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LDR)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jessica A. McElroy is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 2, 2020 (KPM)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 RICO Statement by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Chang - PHV, Cheryl)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kirk Gibbs, Sandra Goulette, Mark Johnson, Ronnie Kahapea, Mark Moffett, SITCOMM Arbitration Association, Alaric Scott. (LDR)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Jessica A. McElroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4161924) by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate)(Powers, Harris)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 RICO Notice. (LDR)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Cookston on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Cookston, Steven)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company, LLC, Corporate Parent PennyMac Financial Services, Inc., Corporate Parent PNMAC Holdings, Inc. for PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Powers, Harris)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Cheryl S. Chang and Nicole B. Metral are hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 12, 2019 (KPM)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Nicole B. Metral to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4160785) by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate)(Powers, Harris)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Cheryl S. Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4160770) by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate)(Powers, Harris)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kirk Gibbs, Sandra Goulette, Mark Johnson, Ronnie Kahapea, Mark Moffett, SITCOMM Arbitration Association, Alaric Scott ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4160127), filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Arbitration Hearing, #5 Exhibit D - Final Arbitration Award)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC v. SITCOMM Arbitration Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Harris Frederick Powers, III
Represented By: Cheryl S. Chang - PHV
Represented By: Jessica A. McElroy - PHV
Represented By: Steven C. Cookston
Represented By: Nicole B. Metral - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SITCOMM Arbitration Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Kahapea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaric Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Goulette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Eeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?