Buford, LLC et al v. Mississippi Sand Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: B.P. Buford, LLC and Ronnie D. Lampkin
Defendant: Joe Cooper, Jim Cooper, Mississippi Sand Solutions, LLC and Robert Cooper
Case Number: 3:2018cv00534
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION To Withhold/Escrow Payments by Mississippi Sand Solutions, LLC (Rector, Kenneth)
September 5, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (KNS)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint,, #1 Complaint , ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint,, #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Mississippi Sand Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Answer of Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Answer of Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Answer of Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Answer of Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Answer of Complaint, #6 Exhibit F to Answer of Complaint, #7 Exhibit G to Answer of Complaint)(Rector, Kenneth)
August 28, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (KNS)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by B.P. Buford, LLC, Ronnie D. Lampkin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32)(McGee, James)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring Plaintiffs to amend or supplement complaint to properly plead subject matter jurisdiction by 8/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 14, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jim Cooper, Joe Cooper, Robert Cooper, Mississippi Sand Solutions, LLC. (KNS)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jim Cooper, Joe Cooper, Robert Cooper, Mississippi Sand Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3780384), filed by B.P. Buford, LLC, Ronnie D. Lampkin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buford, LLC et al v. Mississippi Sand Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.P. Buford, LLC
Represented By: James G. McGee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie D. Lampkin
Represented By: James G. McGee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Sand Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth B. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?