State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood v. Credit Acceptance Corporation
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00353
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Stipulated Briefing Schedule Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 6/25/2019 (nd)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 6/21/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Remand and for Costs and Fees filed by State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood (Liu - PHV, Mimi)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand and for Costs and Fees by State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum Brief)(Liu - PHV, Mimi)
June 3, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #13 : Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (KNS)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Briefing Schedule Order)(Kaufman, R.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Kaufman, R.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Kaufman, R.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MS Retail Installment Contract)(Kaufman, R.)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Elizabeth Paige Boggs and Mimi Liu are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood in association with local counsel and upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 5/24/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Mimi Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3996931) by State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - DC Certificate of Good Standing)(Kirschberg, Jason)
May 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Elizabeth Paige Boggs, $ 100, receipt number 0538-3996763. (ND)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Elizabeth Paige Boggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - IL Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - IN Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3 - DC Certificate of Good Standing)(Kirschberg, Jason)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Anand S. Raman to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Motion for Darren M. Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion for Jonathan Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Patrick G. Rideout to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Anand S. Raman, Darren M. Welch, Jonathan Frank, and Patrick G. Rideout are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation in association with local counsel and upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 5/22/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody C. Bailey on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation (Bailey, Cody)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Patrick McDowell on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation (McDowell, Martin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Patrick G. Rideout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3995336) by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NY Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaufman, R.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Jonathan Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3995327) by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - MA Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaufman, R.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Darren M. Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3995321) by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - VA Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaufman, R.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Anand S. Raman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DC Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaufman, R.)
May 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Anand S. Raman receipt number 0538-3995301 $ 100 (Kaufman, R.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Credit Acceptance Corporation from Chancery Court of the First Judicial District of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CH1:19-cv-515. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3994677) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood v. Credit Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood
Represented By: Blake Anthony Tyler
Represented By: Jacqueline H. Ray-State Gov
Represented By: Jason M. Kirschberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Paige Boggs - PHV
Represented By: Mimi Liu - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Represented By: Darren M. Welch - PHV
Represented By: Patrick G. Rideout - PHV
Represented By: Martin Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Anand S. Raman - PHV
Represented By: Jonathan Frank - PHV
Represented By: Cody C. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?