Nicholson v. Newton Municipal School District et al
Plaintiff: Billy Nicholson
Defendant: Newton Municipal School District and John Does 1-20, Individually
Case Number: 3:2019cv00703
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Newton Municipal School District (Malone, Jessica)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Malone on behalf of Newton Municipal School District (Malone, Jessica)
November 1, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 12/5/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Newton Municipal School District.(Allen, William)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Nicholson. Newton Municipal School District served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Gunn, W.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Newton Municipal School District. (KNS)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-20, Individually, Newton Municipal School District ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4103189), filed by Billy Nicholson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholson v. Newton Municipal School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton Municipal School District
Represented By: Jessica S. Malone
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Nicholson
Represented By: W. Howard Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?