Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc. et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Baptist Medical Center - Leake, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Booneville, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - North Mississippi, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Desoto, Inc., Quitman County Hospital, LLC, Baptist Memorial Hospital - Union County, Inc., Baptist Medical Center - Yazoo, Inc., Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc., Sunflower County Hospital, BMC - Attala, Inc. and Baptist Memorial Hospital - Calhoun, Inc.
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Actavis Totowa LLC, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Allergan PLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC, Anda, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Abbvie Inc., Tasmanian Alkaloids PTY. LTD., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceutcals, Inc., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Walgreen Co., Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.,, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Practice Fusion, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, H.D. Smith, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, KVK-Tech, Inc., Specgx LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Walmart, Inc., Does 1-100, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00279
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 MDL ORDER VACATING re #12 Conditional Transfer Order. (VM)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio. (VM)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BMC - Attala, Inc., Baptist Medical Center - Leake, Inc., Baptist Medical Center - Yazoo, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Booneville, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Calhoun, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Desoto, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - North Mississippi, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Union County, Inc., Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc., Quitman County Hospital, LLC, Sunflower County Hospital (Barrett, John)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorissa S. Smith on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 State Court Record by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Volumes 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons Issued to Abbvie Inc., #4 Attachment Summons Issued to Kroger Limited Partnership, #5 Attachment Summons Issued to Abbott Laboratories, #6 Attachment Summons Issued to Actavis Elizabeth LLC, #7 Attachment Summons Issued to Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #8 Attachment Summons Issued to Kroger Limited Partnership II, #9 Attachment Summons Issued to Actavis LLC, #10 Attachment Summons Issued to Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., #11 Attachment Summons Issued to Cephalon, Inc., #12 Attachment Summons Issued to KVK-Tech, Inc., #13 Attachment Summons Issued to Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., #14 Attachment Summons Issued to Mallinckrodt, LLC, #15 Attachment Summons Issued to CVS Health Corporation, #16 Attachment Summons Issued to Actavis Kadian LLC, #17 Attachment Summons Issued to Millinckrodt, PLC, #18 Attachment Summons Issued to CVS Indiana, LLC, #19 Attachment Summons Issued to Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, #20 Attachment Summons Issued to Noramco, Inc., #21 Attachment Summons Issued to CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #22 Attachment Summons Issued to Actavis Pharma, Inc., #23 Attachment Summons Issued to Endo Health Solutions, Inc., #24 Attachment Summons Issued to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #25 Attachment Summons Issued to Actavis South Atlantic LLC, #26 Attachment Summons Issued to Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #27 Attachment Summons Issued to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #28 Attachment Summons Issued to Actavis Totowa LLC, #29 Attachment Summons Issued to Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc., #30 Attachment Summons Issued to Johnson & Johnson, #31 Attachment Summons Issued to Practice Fusion, Inc., #32 Attachment Summons Issued to Allergan Finance, LLC, #33 Attachment Summons Issued to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #34 Attachment Summons Issued to Rite Aid Corporation, #35 Attachment Summons Issued to Allergan PLC, #36 Attachment Summons Issued to Smith Drug Company, #37 Attachment Summons Issued to Specgx LLC, #38 Attachment Summons Issued to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., #39 Attachment Summons Issued to Tasmanian Alkoloids Pty. Ltd., #40 Attachment Summons Issued to Allergan Sales, LLC, #41 Attachment Summons Issued to Impax Laboratories, LLC, #42 Attachment Summons Issued to Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., #43 Attachment Summons Issued to Henry Schein, Inc., #44 Attachment Summons Issued to H.D. Smith LLC, #45 Attachment Summons Issued to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #46 Attachment Summons Issued to Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC, #47 Attachment Summons Issued to The Kroger Co., #48 Attachment Summons Issued to Walgreen Co., Inc., #49 Attachment Summons Issued to Anda, Inc., #50 Attachment Summons Issued to Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., #51 Attachment Summons Issued to Allergan USA, Inc., #52 Attachment Summons Issued to Wal-Mart, Inc., #53 Attachment Summons Issued to Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., #54 Attachment Summons Issued to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, #55 Attachment Summons Issued to Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., #56 Attachment Summons Issued to Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, #57 Attachment Summons Issued to Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, #58 Attachment Summons Issued to Amerisourcebergen Drug Company, #59 Attachment Summons Issued to Cardinal Health, Inc., #60 Attachment Summons Issued to Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #61 Attachment Summons Issued to Watson Laboratories, Inc., #62 Attachment Entry of Appearance - Cal Mayo, #63 Attachment Entry of Appearance - Kate Embry, #64 Attachment Entry of Appearance - Amanda Alexander, #65 Attachment Entry of Appearance - Quentin Daniels, #66 Attachment Entry of Appearance - Brandon Dorsey, #67 Attachment Notice of Acknowledgement - The Kroger Co., #68 Attachment Notice of Acknowledgement - Kroger Limited Partnership, #69 Attachment Notice of Acknowledgement - Kroger Limited Partnership II, #70 Attachment Notice of Acknowledgment - Cardinal Health, Inc., #71 Attachment Notice of Acknowledgment - Endo Health Solutions, Inc., #72 Attachment Notice of Acknowledgment - Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #73 Attachment Notice of Acknowledgement - Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #74 Attachment Notice of Acknowledgment - Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, #75 Attachment CVS Notice of Removal)(Mayo, J.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Katherine Embry on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Embry, Sarah)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Miles Forks on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Forks, Joseph)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilton V. Byars, III on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Byars, Wilton)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC (Hinshaw, Corey)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Patrick Strubel on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC (Strubel, J.)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Mayo, J.)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 20-200. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4258921) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Part 1 of State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit A - Part 2 of State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit A - Part 3 of State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit A - Part 4 of State Court Complaint)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc. et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasmanian Alkaloids PTY. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Wilton V. Byars, III
Represented By: Joseph Miles Forks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Practice Fusion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: J. Patrick Strubel
Represented By: Corey D. Hinshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Medical Center - Leake, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital - Booneville, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital - North Mississippi, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital - Desoto, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quitman County Hospital, LLC
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital - Union County, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Medical Center - Yazoo, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi Baptist Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunflower County Hospital
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMC - Attala, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital - Calhoun, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?