Reese v. Parks et al
Plaintiff: Howard Eugene Reese, II
Defendant: Deputy Warden Sheila Parks and MDOC
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2021cv00697
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 8 Pro Se Office's Memorandum to Plaintiff, Howard Eugene Reese, II, acknowledging receipt of filing fee. (Attachments: #1 AO 440 Summons form, #2 AO 398 Notice form, #3 AO 399 Waiver form, #4 Rule 4) (CS)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 12/03/2021. (CS)
November 29, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 34643065462. (VM)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Howard Eugene Reese, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 Change of Address filed by Howard Eugene Reese, II. Address updated on docket: Wilkinson County Correctional Facility, 2999 US HWY 61 N, Woodville, MS 39669. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: on or before 12/1/2021, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/01/2021. (CS)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 12/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/01/2021. (CS)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Howard Eugene Reese, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MDOC, Sheila Parks, filed by Howard Eugene Reese, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Parks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Eugene Reese, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Sheila Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?