Jenkins v. Fitzgerald Marine & Repair, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mike Jenkins
Defendant: Fitzgerald Marine & Repair, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00123
Filed: August 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Lewis M. Blanton
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688 Jones Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..1. Mike Jenkins claims against Fitzgerald [docket entry #50]. These were resolved by the stipulation of dismissal reflecting the settlement, which the parties filed on February 3, 2009 [docket entry # 92].2. Mike Jenkins claims against Ingram [docket entry # 50]. These were resolved by the stipulation of dismissal reflecting the settlement, which the partiesfiled on February 3, 2009 [docket entry # 92]. 3. Ingrams cross-claim against Fitzgerald for indemnification [docket e ntry # 43]. This was resolved in Ingrams favor by the summary judgment order [docket entry # 84], and the amount of the judgment will be $217,162.61, as set out. 4. Fitzgeralds cross-claim against Ingram for common law contribution and indemnifi cation [docket entry # 51]. This was resolved in Ingrams favor by the summary judgment order [docket entry # 84], and the amount of the judgment will be $217,162.61, as set out above. I will therefore enter a consolidated judgment in Case Nos. 1 :07CV27 and 1:07CV123 in favor of Ingram on its cross-claims against Fitzgerald in the amount of $217,162.61; all other claims in these two cases are dismissed..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Fitzgeralds motion to enter judgment and certify summary j udgment as final for interlocutory appeal [# 85 in Case No. 1:07CV123] is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Ingrams motion for attorneys fees [#89 in Case No. 1:07CV123] is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 4/27/09. (MRS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2009: # 1 4/29/09) (MRS). Modified on 4/29/2009 (MRS).
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the undersigned will hold a telephone conference with all counsel on Tuesday, February 3, 2009 at 10:00 a.m.Counsel for Fitzgerald will be responsible for placing the call and having allnecessary counsel on the line. The call will be on the record. Telephone Conference set for 2/3/2009 10:00 AM by Telephone before Honorable Catherine D. Perry. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 1/27/09. (CSG)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..DENYING re: 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Crossclaim of Ingram Barge Company filed by Defendant Fitzgerald Marine & Repair, Inc.,..GRANTING 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cross Defendant Ingram Barge Company and Ingram shall have judgment on its crossclaim and on the cross-claims brought against it by Fitzgerald. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 10/27/08. (MRS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Fitzgerald Marine & Repair, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Jenkins
Represented By: Gerard B. Schneller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitzgerald Marine & Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Gossow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?