United Fire & Casualty Insurance Company v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: |
United Fire & Casualty Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Dennis Thompson, Wayne Rockett and Rose Concrete Products, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00051 |
Filed: |
April 28, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Cape Girardeau |
Presiding Judge: |
Lewis M. Blanton |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 26, 2013 |
Filing
168
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Third Party Defendant Spain, Miller and Spain, LLC, Third Party Defendant Matthew B. Lee, Third Party Defendant Kristi Grobe Booker, Third Party Defendant James E. Spain , 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff United Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that United Fire & Casualty Company's Motion for Summary Judgment 141 and Spain, Miller and Spain, LLC and James E. Spain's Motion for Summary Judgment 150 are DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/26/13. (CSG)
|
August 30, 2011 |
Filing
102
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff United Fire Insurances Motion for SummaryJudgment [#69] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs Motion is denied to theextent it seeks summary judgment of Rocketts Counterclaim that it breached its duty of care. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Thompsons Motion for Summary Judgment [#76] is DENIED. Thompsons Motion is denied without prejudice as to Rocketts counterclaim that United Fire Insurance breached its duty of care. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Rocketts Motion for Summary Judgment [#88] is DENIED. Rocketts Motion is denied without prejudice as to Rocketts counterclaim that United Fire Insurance breached its duty of care. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendant Rocketts Motion for Leave to FileSurreply [#101] is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 8/30/11. (MRS)
|
February 10, 2010 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 20 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Party Rose Concrete Products, Inc. and Wayne Rockett filed by Plaintiff United Fire & Casualty Insurance Company motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lewis M. Blanton on 2/10/2010. (JMC) Modified on 2/12/2010 (CSG) - THIS ORDER IS A DUPLICATE OF DOCUMENT #27.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?