Jones v. Lombardi et al
Plaintiff: |
Rodney D. Jones |
Defendant: |
George A. Lombardi, Troy Steele, Steve Atchinson, Buddy McClane, Brian Hoskin, Deborah Vinson, Felicia Dobbs and Unknown Brock |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00162 |
Filed: |
October 18, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Mississippi |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 21, 2012 |
Filing
83
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Brian Hoskins, Defendant Buddy McClane, Defendant Steve Atchinson motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Bryan Hoskins, Buddy McClaine, and Terry Atchison's motion for summary judgment (#72) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/21/12. (MRS)
|
August 10, 2011 |
Filing
37
MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/10/11. (MRS)
|
March 9, 2011 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2),defendants shall reply to plaintiffs claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/9/11. (MRS)
|
February 3, 2011 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for reconsideration and to alter or amend judgment [Doc. #9 and #10] are GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the January 12, 2011 Order of Dismissal is VACATED.IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide to plaintiff a copy of the Court's November 8, 2010 Order, in addition to a copy of the court's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that thirty (30) days from the date of th is Order, plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.98 and file an amended complaint, in compliance with the requirements set forth in the Court's November 8, 2010 Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order shall result in a dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41 (b). (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 3/7/2011.)(copy of Court's Order dated November 8, 2010 and prisioner civil rights forms forwarded to Mr. Jones). Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/3/2011. (JMC)
|
November 8, 2010 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Rodney D. Jones motion is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.98 within thir ty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 12/8/2010. Response to Court due by 12/8/2010.) Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/8/10. (CSG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?