July 20, 2015 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..In light of this Court's decision to grant summary judgment to defendant Graham, defendant's motion to dismiss will be denied as moot. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to add party and motion fo r a temporary restraining order (#98) and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (#106) are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Russell Graham's motion for summary judgment (#100) is GRANTED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that defendant Grahams motion to dismiss (#105) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/20/15. (MRS)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing
96
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 94 PRO SE MOTION Change of Venue adn to Add More Defendants to My Claim filed by Plaintiff Ronald Dale Burston, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for a Change of Venue and to Add More Defendants (#94) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/25/14. (CSG)
|
December 27, 2013 |
Filing
84
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants motion for summary judgment (#64) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to "Add Witness and to Inform of New Evidence" (#74) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/27/2013. (JMC)
|
November 1, 2013 |
Filing
82
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 51 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Ronald Dale Burston, Jr. motion is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall cause Dr. Graham to be served with process at 194 East Lawn Ave., St. Robert, MO 65584. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk shall send plaintiff a blank pro se civil complaint form. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/1/13. (CSG)
|
July 17, 2013 |
Filing
72
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/17/2013. (JMC)
|
April 16, 2013 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Dale Burston, Jr. motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/16/13. (MRS)
|
May 11, 2012 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.. DENYING 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Dale Burston, Jr., GRANTING 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Ronald Dale Burston, Jr. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to is sue upon the complaint as to defendants Michael Hakala, Lisa Barnes, Unknown Dunn, Ruth Taylor, A. Riddell, and Unknown Brook. These defendants shall be served in accordance with the waiver agreements the Court maintains with the Missouri Attorney Ge neral's Office and with Correctional Medical Services. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2),defendants Michael Hakala, Lisa Barnes, Unknown Dunn, Ruth Taylor, A. Riddell, and Unknown Brook shall reply to plaintiff s claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to plaintiff's off icial capacity claims against the defendants because as to these claims the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both.( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 6/11/2012.) Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/11/12. (MRS)
|