March 19, 2014 |
Filing
85
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant City of Sikeston, Defendant Frankie Adams; motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's request for additional time to conduct discovery is D ENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's objections to the Affidavit of Officer Adams are OVERRULED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that defendants Franklin Adams and City of Sikeston's joint motion for summary judgment (ECF #72) is GRANTED. A separate Judgment in favor of defendants will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/19/14. (CSG)
|
May 13, 2013 |
Filing
69
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Take Deposition of Prisoner by Written Questions (#63) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/13/2013. (JMC)
|
April 4, 2013 |
Filing
65
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Compel (#45) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Compel Adequate Initial Disclosure (#46) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's M otion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and to Overrule Objection (#57) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion Regarding the Sufficiency of Defendants' Denials, Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's Requests for Ad mission (#59) is DENIED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED THAT plaintiff's Motion to Take Deposition of Prisoner by Written Questions (#63) is held in abeyance, and defendants are ordered to respond to that motion no later than April 25, 2013. ( Response to Court due by 4/25/2013.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/4/2013. (JMC)
|
January 24, 2013 |
Filing
47
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/24/2013. (JMC)
|
November 1, 2012 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Paul Freeman; motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/1/2012. (JMC)
|
October 15, 2012 |
Filing
22
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Paul Freeman - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. #4] is DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/15/2012. (JMC)
|
August 27, 2012 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to be issued upon the amended complaint [Doc. #8] as to defendant Frankie Adams in his individual capacity only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in his indivi dual capacity, defendant Frankie Adams shall file an answer or other responsive pleading directed to plaintiff's amended complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the amended complaint is DISMISSED, without prejudice, as to defendant Frankie Adams in his official capacity. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (standard prisoner actions). A separate order directing the dismissal of specific claims will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/27/2012. (JMC)
|
June 29, 2012 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $5.60 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint, in accordance with the instructions set forth in this Memorandum and Order, no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall mail to plaintiff five blank form complaints for the filing of a prisoner civil rights complaint, as well as five blank form motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may request additional forms from the Clerk, as needed.( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 7/30/2012.) Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/29/2012. (five blank complaint and ifp forms forwarded to Mr. Freeman)(JMC)
|