Hill v. Dodson et al
Plaintiff: |
Craig Hill |
Defendant: |
Danny Dodson and Douglas Fitzwater |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00135 |
Filed: |
July 25, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Pemiscot |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 24, 2013 |
Filing
99
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 87 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Danny Dodson, 85 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Craig Hill, 92 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Craig Hill, 35 MOTION to Compel filed b y Plaintiff Craig Hill, 90 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Douglas Fitzwater, 59 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defendant Douglas Fitzwater, 89 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Craig Hill, 44 MO TION to Strike 42 Letter and Response to Plaintiff Craig Hill's "7-4.04 Communication with the Court" Dated "12-03-2012" filed by Defendant Douglas Fitzwater, 34 MOTION for Issuance Subpoenas filed by Plain tiff Craig Hill, 49 MOTION to Strike filed by Plaintiff Craig Hill, 65 MOTION to Strike 62 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Craig Hill, 37 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Craig Hill, 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 DCM Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Craig Hill, 45 MOTION to Exclude Illegally Obtained Medical Records filed by Plaintiff Craig Hill. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas (Doc. No. 34) be and it i s denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide plaintiff with a blank subpoena form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motions to compel (Docs. No. 35, 37, 85, 89) be and they are denied. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (Doc. No. 36) be and it is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Suppress Illegally Obtained Medical Records (Doc. No. 45) be and it is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat plaintiff's motion to strike (Doc. No. 49) be and it is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to strike (Doc. No. 65) be and it is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Fitzwater's Motion to Strike (D oc. No. 44) be and it is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Docket Number 42 be and it is STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD as improperly filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Fitzwater's Motion to Compel Discovery (Doc. No. 59) be and it is denie d as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Dodson's Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. No. 87) be and it is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Fitzwater's Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. No. 90) be and it is denied. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Temporary Counsel (Doc. No. 92) be and it is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lewis M. Blanton on 9/24/13. (CSG)
|
March 26, 2013 |
Filing
75
MEMORANDUM: As stated in the Request for Status Report, "Before the court can order the plaintiff to respond to interrogatories and motion to produce, the court would need to see a copy of Defendant Dodson's interrogatories and motion to produce." Defendant Dodson should file with the Clerk a copy of the interrogatories and motion to produce previously submitted to the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lewis M. Blanton on 3/26/13. (CSG)
|
September 24, 2012 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 16 MOTION to Add Party filed by Plaintiff Craig Hill. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, as to defendant Danny Dodson, plaintiff's"1983 Amendment" [Doc. #15] is DISMISSED, without prejudice pursuant to 28U.S.C. 167; 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, as to Josh Bost, the "1983 Amendment" is SEVERED from this action and is DISMISSED, without prejudice. SeeFed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(2) and 21. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to add an additional defendant [Doc. #16] is DENIED, as moot. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/25/12. (CSG)
|
August 16, 2012 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Craig Hill motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRAN TED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, as to plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment medical indifference claims against Dr. Douglas Fitzwater and Danny Dodson in their individual capacities, the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to be issued on the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants Dr. Douglas Fitzwater and Danny Dodson shall reply to plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment medical indifference claims within the time provided by the appli cable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, as to defendant County of Pemiscot, the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint, because the complaint is legally f rivolous and fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (standard prisoner actions). A separate Order of Partial Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/16/12. (CSG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?