Austin et al v. United States Department of Agriculture, Rural Development
Plaintiff: |
Phyllis Austin and Penelope Burris |
Defendant: |
United States Department of Agriculture, Rural Development |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00137 |
Filed: |
August 6, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Ripley |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 6, 2013 |
Filing
19
AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (#15) is GRANTED for the reasons stated herein on this day, May 1, 2013, at 4:30 p.m.;IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that defendant is enjoined from selling "All of Lots 23 and 24, Lingo Ranchette No. 2, as shown by plat on file in the office of Recorder of Deeds of Ripley County, Missouri," which is currently set for Trustee's Sale on May 6, 2013, between 10:00 a.m. and 2:00 p.m., until such time as a hearing on a preliminary injunction may be heard on this matter by the Court of Federal Claims or this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Hearing (#16) is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the event the Court of Federal Claims does not assume jurisdiction over this case, a hearing on preliminary injunction will be set at a later date by this Court. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (#17) is held in abeyance pending transfer of this matter to the Court of Federal Claims. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/6/2013. (JMC)
|
May 1, 2013 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (#15) is GRANTED for the reasons stated herein on this day, May 1, 2013, at 4:30 p.m.; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant is enjoined from selling "All of Lots 23 and 24, Lingo Ranchette No. 2, as shown by plat on file in the office of Recorder of Deeds of Ripley County, Missouri," which is currently set for Trustee's Sale on May 6, 2013, b etween 10:00 a.m. and 2:00 p.m., until such time as a hearing on a preliminary injunction may be heard on this matter by the Court of Federal Claims or this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Hearing (#16) is GRANTE D; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the event the Court of Federal Claims does not assume jurisdiction over this case, a hearing on preliminary injunction will be set at a later date by this Court.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint(#17) is held in abeyance pending transfer of this matter to the Court of Federal Claims. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/1/2013. (JMC)
|
March 15, 2013 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant United States Department of Agriculture, Rural Development, 12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Penelope Burris, Plaintiff Phyllis Austin: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss (#6) is DENIED and plaintiffs' motion to transfer (#12) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall transfer this case to the Court of Federal Claims., Terminate Case. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/15/2013. (JMC)
|
December 11, 2012 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Penelope Burris, Plaintiff Phyllis Austin motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/11/12. (MRS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?