Shipley v. Iron County, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: |
Stuard T. Shipley |
Defendant: |
Virginia Queen, Iron County Sheriff's Department, James (Jimmy) Mays, Dustin Walker, Iron County, Missouri, Bessi Lynn Nash, Don Barzewski and Bradford Johnson |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00038 |
Filed: |
February 22, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Randolph |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 15, 2013 |
Filing
22
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Doc. No. 15). IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for the Court to reconsider the dismissal of Defendant James May is DE NIED. (Doc. No. 16). Plaintiff did not allege in his amended complaint or in his motion for reconsideration that May actually had knowledge of the complained-of conduct. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that in light of Defendant Nashs representation that on July 1, 2013, her Rule 26 Disclosures were mailed to Plaintiff, Plaintiff's motion to compel these Disclosures is DENIED as moot. (Doc. No. 20.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/15/2013. (JMC)
|
May 3, 2013 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendant Bessi Lynn Nash.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendant Nash shall repl y to plaintiffs claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs official-capacity claims are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk sha ll not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants James Mays, Don Barzewski, Bradford Johnson, Dustin Walker, or Virginia Queen because, as to these defendants, the complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/3/13. (MRS)
|
March 26, 2013 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $19.28 within thirty (30) days of the date of t his Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to p laintiff a Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff use the form and submit an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, this action will be dismissed without further proceedings. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 4/25/2013., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 4/25/2013.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/26/2013. (Prisoner Civil Rights Form forwarded to Mr. Shipley)(JMC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?