February 23, 2015 |
Filing
98
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..DENYING: 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Eric Pritchett, GRANTING 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Brett Hays, Defendant Steven Buhs, Defendant Anthony Parker, Defendant Jam es Hack, Defendant Donna Wigfall, Defendant Jessie May, Defendant Clifton Cossey, Defendant Richard Trout, Defendant Kevin McKay, Defendant William Petty, Defendant Cheryl Thompson, Defendant Stephen R. Bergeron, Defendant Ryan Moss, Defenda nt Ian Wallace, Defendant Bobby Cantrell, Defendant Cortney S. Bailey, Defendant Richard B. Lincoln, Defendant Brandi Meridith, Defendant Jared Kline, Defendant Lorene Armstrong, Defendant Bryan Hoskins. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/23/15. (MRS)
|
October 31, 2014 |
Filing
94
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Kircher and Reeses motion for summary judgment (#62) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motions for default (#71, #83) and appointment of counsel (#91) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/31/14. (MRS)
|
October 22, 2014 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion to transfer (#81) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion regarding amended the Case Management Order (#65) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion for reconsideration (#67) is DENIED.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the defendants shall file a report to the Court as requested above regarding plaintiffs ability to access the materials and other resources he requires to prosecute his case effectively no later than November 7, 2014. ( Response to Court due by 11/7/2014.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/22/14. (MRS)
|
February 12, 2014 |
Filing
49
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 41] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/12/2014. (JMC)
|
January 10, 2014 |
Filing
42
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the January 9, 2013 Memorandum and Order directed to counsel David Kirby is VACATED IN PART, with respect to the requirement that Mr. Kirby provide the Court with the last known addresses of defendants Cynthia Reese and Nena Kircher. All other respects of the January 9, 2013 Memorandum and Order remain in full force and effect.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall update the docket toreflect the correct names of the defendants, as reflected on the entries of appearance, answers and waiver of service filed by counsel for defendants on January 2, 2014 [Docs. #36 and #37], Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/10/14. (MRS)
|
January 9, 2014 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order, Mr. J. Thaddeus Eckenrode shall provide the Court with the last known address of defendant Nurse Kenna Saddler, who was formerly employed at SECC. Mr . Eckenrodes response to this Order should be entitled "In Camera Response to Order of January 9, 2013," and should be mailed directly to the chambers of the undersigned/ Response to Court due by 1/24/2014.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon re ceipt of the in camera response, the Court will notify plaintiff in writing whether an address for Nurse Kenna Saddler has been provided, and if so, the Court will arrange for issuance of summons and Marshal's forms on plaintiff's behalf. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/9/14. (MRS)
|
December 4, 2013 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Eric Pritchett motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/4/13. (MRS)
|
November 19, 2013 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall show cause no later than twenty-one days from the date of this Order why defendants Employee ID #109476, Unknown Hayes, Unknown Kircher, Unknown Kline, Unknown Reese, and Kenna Saddler should not be dismissed under Rule 4(m) without prejudice. Show Cause Response due by 12/10/2013. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/19/13. (MRS)
|
August 21, 2013 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants shall reply to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel [ECF No. 6] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff 's motions to amend [ECF Nos. 7, 10] are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as specified in this Memorandum and Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: PrisonerStandard. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/21/13. (MRS)
|
August 12, 2013 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.70 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Or der. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts' Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Memorandum and Order, this action will be dismissed. ( Response to Court due by 9/11/2013.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/12/13. (MRS)
|