Harris v. Corizon Medical Services et al
Plaintiff: |
Jim Harris, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Corizon Medical Services, Ernest Jackson, Robert Bessey, Jessica Unknown, Unknown Hicks, Barbara Unknown and Amanda Gibson |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00147 |
Filed: |
October 3, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Mississippi |
Presiding Judge: |
Lewis M. Blanton |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 23, 2020 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 50 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for an Order from the Court directing the Missouri Department of Corrections to stop taking funds from his prison account to pay filing fees for this matter, and to reimburse him for funds already deducted [ECF No. 50] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal ofthis Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/23/20. (CSG)
|
October 31, 2014 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant R. Eric Bessey, D.D.S.'s motion to dismiss [ECF #25] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/31/2014. (JMC)
|
January 29, 2014 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $23.28 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States Distr ict Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of case until receipt of the account statement [Doc. #6] is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. #8] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Adam E.Hanna, 3113 Independence Street, Cape Girardeau, Missouri, phone number 573-334-0555, is appointed to representplaintif f in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide a complete copy of the court file to plaintiff's appointed counsel at no cost. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's counsel shall have 45 days to file an amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion requesting the Court to respond to his claim [Doc. #9] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART inaccordance with this Court's Memorandum and Order. The Court has grantedplaintiff's motion for appointment o f counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's request for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order is DENIED. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 3/17/2014., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 2/28/2014.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lewis M. Blanton on 1/29/2014. (JMC)
|
January 23, 2014 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #4] is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lewis M. Blanton on 1/23/2014. (JMC)
|
October 3, 2013 |
Filing
2
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the 036;350 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his pr ison account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed, the dismissal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 11/4/2013. Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 11/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lewis M. Blanton on 10/3/2013. (JMC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?