Kennett, City Of v. Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff: |
Kennett, City Of |
Defendant: |
Environmental Protection Agency and Karl Brooks |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00033 |
Filed: |
March 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Dunklin |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause of Action: |
30 U.S.C. ยง 181 Environment: Review of Agency Action |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 28, 2017 |
Filing
79
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 67 MOTION to Exclude Exhibits used by Defendants' Experts filed by Plaintiff Kennett, City Of, 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Kennett, City Of, 63 MOTION for Summar y Judgment filed by Defendant Environmental Protection Agency, Defendant Karl Brooks. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (#50) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment (#63) is GRANTED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to exclude (#67) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/28/17. (CSG)
|
October 19, 2015 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the EPA's requested staggered summary judgment schedule is ADOPTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file its motion for summary judgment and supporting memorandum (not exceeding 35 pag es) and affidavits no later than January 15, 2016. Defendant shall file its cross-motion for summary judgment and supporting memorandum (not to exceed 35 pages) and affidavits no later than April 14, 2016. Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its motion and its opposition to defendants cross-motion (not to exceed 25 pages) as well as any supporting rebuttal affidavits no later than June 13, 2016. Defendant shall file its reply memorandum (not to exceed 25 pages) and rebuttal affidavits no later than August 12, 2016. Any sur-memoranda must be filed no later than September 2, 2016. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/19/15. (MRS)
|
October 1, 2015 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 31 MOTION for Leave to Complete the Administrative Record and to Produce Expert Reports filed by Plaintiff Kennett, City Of. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion (#31) is granted in part and deni ed in part, as explained herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall jointly submit a proposal for amending the remaining deadlines in the Case Management Order no later than October 14, 2015. (Response to Court due by 10/14/2015.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/1/15. (CSG)
|
July 2, 2015 |
Filing
37
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 31 MOTION for Leave to Complete the Administrative Record and to Produce Expert Reports filed by Plaintiff Kennett, City Of. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion (#31) is held in abeyance. IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that defendant shall have until July 30, 2015 in which to file a complete response to plaintiff's motion. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the deadline for the parties' cross motions for summary judgment is STAYED. Response to Court due by 7/30/2015. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/2/15. (CSG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?