Smith v. Wallace et al
Plaintiff: |
Derrick Ray Smith |
Defendant: |
Ian Wallace, Unknown Massey, Anita Hill, Brandy Juden and Unknown Wilhite |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00146 |
Filed: |
October 14, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Cape Girardeau |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 29, 2016 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) (Docket No. 104) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/29/2016. (JMC)
|
August 24, 2016 |
Filing
84
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Clerk shall open a new case with the documents filed by plaintiff in this case on July 21, 2016, and those documents shall be stricken from the docket sheet; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to withdraw the amended complaint (#81) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/24/2016. (JMC)
|
May 14, 2015 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #8] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.98 on or before June 15, 2015 . Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial, without first showing good cause, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, consistent with this Memorandum and Order, plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint on or before June 15, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order [Doc. #14] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that , pursuant to the Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (standard prisoner actions).§W(b( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 6/15/2015. Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 6/15/2015.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/14/2015. (JMC)
|
November 10, 2014 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion [ECF No. 4] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within (60) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (60) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the court will dismiss this act ion without prejudice. If the case is dismissed, the dismissal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g).6 ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 1/9/2015.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/10/2014. (JMC)
|
October 20, 2014 |
Filing
2
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Motion to Proce ed in Forma Pauperis - Prisoner Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 fil ing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in formapauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison accoun t statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed, the dismi ssal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 11/19/2014. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/20/2014. (prisoner civil rights form and motion ifp form forwarded to Mr. Smith)(JMC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?