Ciesla v. Christian et al
Plaintiff: |
Andrew Ciesla |
Defendant: |
C. B. Christian, D. McDaniel, Pemiscot County, Missouri and City of Hayti, Missouri |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00165 |
Filed: |
November 18, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Pemiscot |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 30, 2016 |
Filing
71
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant C. B. Christian, 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV filed by Defendant C. B. Christian. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Chr istian's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 19) as to Counts II, III, V, and VI is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Christian's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV (Doc. 54) is granted. A separate Judgment in favor of Defendant Christian will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 3/30/16. (CSG)
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 43 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant City of Hayti, Missouri, Defendant Pemiscot County, Missouri, Defendant D. McDaniel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Compel (Doc. 43) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' Second Request for Production of Documents within fourteen days from the date of this Order, that is no later than January 22, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 1/8/16. (CSG)
|
August 17, 2015 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 28 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant C. B. Christian; motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Christian's Motion to Compel (Doc. 28) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall a nswer Defendant Christian's Interrogatories and fully respond to Defendant Christian's Requests for Production no later than August 24, 2015. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order could result in the imposition of sanctions pursuant to Rule 37(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 8/17/15. (CSG)
|
February 24, 2015 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant C. B. Christian. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Christian's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8) is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff' ;s Request for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Doc. 10) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 21 days to file an Amended Complaint correcting the deficiencies set out in this Memorandum and Order. (Response to Court due by 3/17/2015.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 2/24/15. (CSG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?