Daniel v. Penrod et al
Plaintiff: |
Catina Denise Daniel |
Defendant: |
Bobby Penrod, Rick Walter, David Dolan and Scott Horman |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00023 |
Filed: |
January 30, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Scott |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 3, 2015 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Catina Denise Daniel; motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $13.3 3 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case num ber; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). An Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 4/2/2015.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/3/15. (CSG)
|
February 9, 2015 |
Filing
2
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Motion to Proc eed in Forma Pauperis - Prisoner Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 fi ling fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison acco unt statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed, the dismissal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Response to Court due by 3/11/2015. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/9/15. (CSG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?