Kingcade v. Trowbridge et al
Plaintiff: |
Forest Conan Kingcade |
Defendant: |
Tim Trowbridge, Brandon Moore, Mark Dennis, Alan Campbell and Phillip Caldwell |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00024 |
Filed: |
February 2, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Dunklin |
Presiding Judge: |
Abbie Crites-Leoni |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 8, 2017 |
Filing
103
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Forest Conan Kingcade, 87 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Phillip Caldwell, Defendant Alan Campbell, Defendant Steven Gregory, D efendant Tim Trowbridge, Defendant Brandon Moore, Defendant Mark Dennis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Strike (Doc. 97) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Supplemental Motion of Defendants Tim Trowbridge, Philip Caldw ell, Mark Dennis, Allan Campbell, Brandon Moore, and Stephen Gregory for Summary Judgment (Doc. 87) is denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter will be set for trial after a telephoneconference with the parties is held on a date to be determined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 9/8/17. (CSG)
|
July 15, 2016 |
Filing
68
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 66 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Forest Conan Kingcade motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauper is on appeal [Doc. 66] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.60 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and ( 4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 7/15/16. (CSG)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 59 PRO SE MOTION filed by Plaintiff Forest Conan Kingcade, 58 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Forest Conan Kingcade, 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Phillip Caldwell, Defen dant Alan Campbell, Defendant Steven Gregory, Defendant Tim Trowbridge, Defendant Brandon Moore, Defendant Mark Dennis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 49)is granted. A separate Judgment in favor of Defendants will accompany this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Kingcade's pending Motions (Docs. 58, 59) are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 6/6/16. (CSG)
|
March 18, 2015 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Forest Conan Kingcade, 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Forest Conan Kingcade, 10 MOTION to Appoint Couns el filed by Plaintiff Forest Conan Kingcade. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.38 wit hin thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number ; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days, without first showing good cause, the Court will dismiss this action without pre judice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to be issued upon the complaint as to all defendants in their individual capacities.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1997e(g)(2), defendants shall reply to the complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [Doc. #8] is DENIED without prejudice, as premature . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. #10] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (standard prisoner actions).(Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 4/17/2015.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 3/18/15. (CSG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?