Beckermann v. Hickey et al
Plaintiff: |
Jeffrey A. Beckermann |
Defendant: |
Brandy L. Hickey, M. Pruitt, Jason Unknown, Dana A. Degen, Cole W. Bull, April Samples, Travis Bentsen, John Eppolito, Julie Fipps and Unknown Employee |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00209 |
Filed: |
November 12, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Mississippi |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 25, 2016 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [[ECF No. 19] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/25/2016. (JMC)
|
January 19, 2016 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of time [ECF No. 10] is GRANTED. Plaintiff must inform the Court of defendant Jason Unknowns full name no later than February 25, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 11] is DENIED without prejudice.( Response to Court due by 2/25/2016.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/19/2016. (JMC)
|
January 4, 2016 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on all defendants except for Jason Unknown.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must inform the Court of Jason Unknowns full name within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. Response to Court due by 1/25/2016.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/4/16. (MRS)
|
November 24, 2015 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $4.80 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for a n original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must submit an amended complaint within twenty-eight (28) days of the date of this Order. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/22/2015., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 12/24/2015.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/24/2015. (JMC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?