Watson v. Charleston, City of, MO et al
Plaintiff: |
Robert F. Watson |
Defendant: |
Charleston, City of, MO and Zach Albright |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00021 |
Filed: |
February 1, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Mississippi |
Presiding Judge: |
Abbie Crites-Leoni |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 23, 2017 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 32, 38, 42) are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Watson's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 52) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 3/23/17. (MRS)
|
November 17, 2016 |
Filing
41
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide Defendant with his initial disclosures as directed above in this Order no later than December 1, 2016. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of Plaintiffs Co mplaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Second Motion for an Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions (Doc. 40) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for filing any dispositive motion is extended to December 30, 2016. Opposition briefs must be filed no later than January 30, 2017, and any reply brief must be filed no later than February 13, 2017. motion is GRANTED( Dispositive Motions due by 12/30/2016.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 11/17/16. (MRS)
|
October 17, 2016 |
Filing
36
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Subpoena (Doc. 26) is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 30) is denied without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that Plaintiff shall provide Defendant with his initialdisclosures as directed above in this Order no later than 14 days from the date of this Order, which is October 31, 2016. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the imposition of sanctions under Rule 37(b), including dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 10/17/2016. (JMC)
|
August 26, 2016 |
Filing
31
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Compel (Doc. 28) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide Defendant with his initial disclosures no later than September 6, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 8/26/2016. (JMC)
|
March 29, 2016 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendant Zach Albright. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants the City of Charleston and the Charleston Police Department are DISMISSED without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/29/16. (MRS)
|
March 3, 2016 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Robert F. Watson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No.2] is GRANTED. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $1.00 within thirty (30) days ofthe date ofthis Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include u pon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. If plaintiff fails to do so, the Court will dismiss this case without further proceedings. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 3/24/2016, Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 4/4/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 3/3/16. (CSG)
|
February 8, 2016 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Robert F. Watson ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 3/9/2016.), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $4 00 filing fee or submit a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed, the dismissal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g).( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 3/9/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 2/8/16. (MRS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?