November 26, 2018 |
Filing
81
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Gregory Hancock, Defendant Matthew Schaefer, Defendant Jerry Walls, Defendant Jeremiah Brown, Defendant Charles Wilson, Defendant Claude Bagby - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED on plaintiffs failure-to-protect, excessive force, and inhumane conditions of confinement claims against defendant Bagby. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion for sum mary judgment is DENIED on plaintiff's failure-to-protect claim against defendant Brown." IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment is DENIED on plaintiff's failure-to-protect claim against defendant Wal ls. IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED on plaintiff's failure-to-protect and inhumane conditions of confinement claims against defendant Schaefer. IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED that defendant's mo tion for summary judgment is DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART on plaintiff's claims against defendant Wilson.Summary judgment is GRANTED on plaintiff's claims for excessive force and inhumane conditions of confinement against Wilson. Summ ary judgment is DENIED on plaintiff's failure-to-protect claim against Wilson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment is DENIED on plaintiff's failure-to-protect claim against defendant Hancock. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/26/2018. (JMC)
|
April 19, 2018 |
Filing
52
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF #46] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/19/2018. (JMC)
|
September 13, 2017 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed, without prejudice, as to defendant Bryan Robinson. A separate order of partial dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/13/2017. (JMC)
|
February 27, 2017 |
Filing
33
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed, without prejudice, as to defendant John Mills. A separate order of partial dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/27/17. (CSG)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's official capacity claims against all defendants are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the amended complaint, pursuant to the service agreement the Court maintains with the Missouri Attorney General's Office, as to defendants John Mills, Claude Bagby, Bryan Robinson, Gregory Hancock, Charles Wilson, Jeremiah Brown, Jerry Walls, a nd Unknown Schefer in their individual capacities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in their individual capacities, defendants John Mills, Claude Bagby, Bryan Robinson, Gregory Hancock, Charles Wilson, Jeremiah Brown, Jerry Walls, and Unknown Schefer shal l reply to the amended complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Tamara Hendrix, Michael Vinson, Dennis Mayberry, Ian Wallace, Bill Sta nge, Paula Reed, Omer Clark, Jefferson Kidd, Darron Hyte, Regina Beggs, Crystal Steward, Bruce Hannabrink, Cynthia Reese, Jane Bucanan, Terry White, Dwayne Kempker, and Brad Clark are dismissed without prejudice. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). A separate Order of Dismissal will be entered herewith. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/9/2016. (JMC)
|
July 6, 2016 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $6.20 within thirty (30) days fr om the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remi ttance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on a Court-provided form, in accordance with the instructions set forth above. IT IS FURT HER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail plaintiff a copy of the Court's form prisoner complaint for filing a civil rights action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. 3] is DENIED without prejudice. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 8/5/2016., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 8/5/2016.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/6/2016. (JMC)
|