March 21, 2017 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 25 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Kimberly Birch, Defendant Nina Hill, Defendant Billie Jo Gasaway, Defendant Stormi Moeller, Defendant Todd Renshaw, Defendant Linda Ahlfield, Defendant Glen Babi ch, Defendant Kimberly Randolph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by defendants Nina Hill, Linda Ahlfield, Kimberly Randolph, Kimberly Birch, Stormi Moeller, Billie Jo Gasaway, GlenBabich, and Todd Renshaw (Docket No. 25) is GR ANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Nina Hill, Linda Ahlfield, Kimberly Randolph, Kimberly Birch, Stormi Moeller, Billie Jo Gasaway, Glen Babich, and Todd Renshaw are DISMISSED from this action. An order of dismissal will be filed separately. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 3/21/17. (CSG)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 11 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Pay Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff Robert Lee motion is DENIED as moot. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for extension of time to pay thefiling fee (Docket No. 11) is DE NIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Corizon Medical Services is DISMISSED from this action.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Missouri Department of Corrections isDISMISSED from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the official ca pacity claims against defendants Hill, Aufield, Randolph, Renshaw, Birch, Moeller, Gasaway, Babich, Wallace, Stange, Reed, and Beggs are DISMISSED.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the amended comp laint, pursuant to the service agreement the Court maintains with Corizon, as to defendants Hill, Aufield, Randolph, Renshaw, Birch, Moeller, Gasaway, and Babich in their individual capacities. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issueupon the amended complaint, pursuant to the service agreement the Court maintains with the Missouri Attorney General's Office, as to defendants Wallace, Stange, Reed, and Beggs in their individual capacities. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that, in their individual capacities, defendants Hill, Aufield, Randolph, Renshaw, Birch, Moeller, Gasaway, Babich, Wallace, Stange, Reed, andBeggs shall reply to the amended complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 11/7/16. (MRS)
|
May 20, 2016 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $9.83 within thirty (30) days fro m the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remit tance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on a Court-provided form, in accordance with the instructions set forth above. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail plaintiff a copy of the Court's form prisoner complaint for filing a civil rights action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's second motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 4] is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 6/20/2016., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 6/20/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 6/20/2016. (forms forwarded to Mr. Lee)(JMC) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/20/2016) (JMC).
|