Hamilton v. Ragland et al
Plaintiff: |
Henry Hamilton |
Defendant: |
Calvin Ragland, City of Hayti, Missouri, Amy Inman and Glenda Overby |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00054 |
Filed: |
March 18, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Dunklin |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 15, 2018 |
Filing
90
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims for declaratory and injunctive relief set forth in Count II is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/15/18. (CSG)
|
September 18, 2018 |
Filing
86
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 65 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Henry Hamilton, 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Amy Leeann Inman, 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Def endant City of Hayti, Missouri, 76 MOTION to Strike 71 Declaration filed by Defendant City of Hayti, Missouri, 85 MOTION to Strike Argument in Plaintiff's Reply in Support of His Motion for Summary Judgment f iled by Defendant Amy Leeann Inman. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Hayti's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts I and III (ECF No. 57) is GRANTED. IT IS FUTHER ORDERED that Inman's Motion for Summary Judgment on all claims against her (ECF No. 60) is GRANTED. IT IS FUTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as toLiability under the Eighth and Fourteenth Amendments (ECF No. 65) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Hayti's Motion to Strike Portions of PlaintiffsD eclaration (ECF No. 76) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FINALY ORDERED that Inman's Motion to Strike Arguments in Plaintiffs Reply in Support of His Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 85) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/18/18. (CSG)
|
March 2, 2017 |
Filing
42
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant City of Hayti, Missouri as to Counts II & III (ECF No. 9) is GRANTED as to the claims for monetary damages. Plaintiff's claims for declaratory and injun ctive relief set forth in Counts II and III, as well as any federal § 1983 claims under Count III, remain pending. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant Calvin Ragland (ECF No. 11) is GRANTED and Counts I, II, a nd III as to Defendant Ragland are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant Glenda Overbey (ECF No. 24) is GRANTED and Counts I, II, and III as to Defendant Overbey are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that D efendant Amy Leeann Inman's Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 18) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion of Defendant City of Hayti, Missouri, and Calvin Ragland to Deny Certification of Class Action Status t o Plaintiff and Dismiss Plaintiffs Class Claims (ECF No. 13) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Deny Defendant City of Hayti's Motion to Dismiss as to Counts II and III or in the Alternative to Stay Disposition (ECF No. 35) is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/2/2017. (JMC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?