Harris v. Hill
Plaintiff: Jim Harris, Jr.
Defendant: Nina Hill, Corizon, LLC and Paula Huffman-Reed
Case Number: 1:2016cv00083
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 94 MOTION to Clarify 91 Memorandum & Order,, 92 Judgment - (Case) filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr., 95 MOTION to Disqualify Judge filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr., 96 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed b y Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for rehearing/clarification (#94), motion to disqualify judge (#95), and motion to appoint counsel (#96) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/19/18. (CSG)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 99 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is GRANTED. [ECF No. 99] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court ," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an appellate proceeding. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/18/2018.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/18/18. (CSG)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Nina Hill, 90 MOTION to Strike 89 Surreply to Motion filed by Defendant Nina Hill, 87 PRO SE MOTION to Allow Doc. #83 and #82 to Remain as Submitted to this Court filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant's motion for summary judgment (#72) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's "Motion to Allow Doc. #83 and #82 to Remain As Submitted to this Court" (#87) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion to strike (#90) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/29/18. (CSG)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 80 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of: time to prevail on the merits of his claims filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr., 78 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall send to plaintiff a current copy of the docket sheet. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Compel (#78) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Extension (#80) is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have until January 5, 2018 by which to file his response to the defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/28/17. (CSG)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 53 MOTION to Supplement 13 Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr., 63 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr., 55 MOTION for Leave to filed by Defendant Nina Hill, 46 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Masters filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr., 39 MOTION to Seal Document 29 Affidavit, 30 Affidavit filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr., 40 MOTION for Reconsideration re 36 Memorandum & Order, filed by Pla intiff Jim Harris, Jr., 47 PRO SE MOTION for Court Appointed Expert filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal (#39) is DENIED. The Clerk shall send to plaintiff a current copy of th e docket sheet. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider (#40) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Master (#46) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Expe rt (#47) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Add Ex. ID(3) (#53) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel to Take Depositions (#63) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's Motion to File Surreply (#55) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/29/17. (CSG) (Main Document 68 replaced on 6/29/2017) (CSG).
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. #7] is DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Hill should respond to plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief [Doc. #2] within thirty (30) days of receipt of the amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/7/16. (CSG)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr.; motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 6] i s GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $1.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court,&q uot; and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve defendant Nina Hill with process in accordance with the Court's agreement with Corizon, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, along with her responsive pleading, defendant Nina hill must show cause why plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction should not be granted. IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that defendants Paula Huffman-Reed and Corizon, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/6/2016.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/6/16. (CSG)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Motion to Proce ed in Forma Pauperis - Prisoner Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 fil ing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison accou nt statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed, the dismissal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 5/19/2016. Response to Court due by 5/19/2016. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/19/16. (CSG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Harris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Huffman-Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?