Bader Farms, Inc. et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Bader Farms, Inc. and Bill Bader
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00299
Filed: December 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Dunklin
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 322 MOTION for Reconsideration re 288 Memorandum & Order filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that BASF's motion to reconsider (#322) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/3/20. (CSG)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 339 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 336 SEALED MOTION filed by Plaintiff Bill Bader, Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc., 337 Joint MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Steve Smith filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. IT I S HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to allow testimony of Steve Smith (#336) is GRANTED and defendants' motion to exclude testimony of Steve Smith (#337) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall make Steve Smith available for deposition within 10 days. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/14/20. (CSG)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants motions for summary judgment [#218, #221] are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/31/19. (MRS)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants motion for summary judgment on damages [#224] is GRANTED in part, and plaintiffs may not seek damages based on their experts $42 million damages calculation.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/26/19. (MRS)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Damages filed by Defendant BASF Corporation, Defendant Monsanto Company, 203 Joint MOTION to Strike Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike Supplemental and Rebuttal Expert Report of Joseph Guenthner filed by Defendant Monsanto Company, 213 Joint MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Joseph Guenthner filed by Defendant BASF Corporation, Defendant Monsanto Company. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants' motion for summary judgment on damages [#224], defendants' motion to strike the supplemental and rebuttal expert report of Dr. Joseph Guenthner [#203], and defendants' motion to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' expert Dr. Joseph Guenthner [#213] are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/20/19. (CSG)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 269 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Guido Schnabel and Supplemental Document Production of Dr. Phillip Brannen filed by Plaintiff Bill Bader, Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc. motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/11/19. (MRS)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants' motion to exclude the expert testimony of Dr. Ford Baldwin [#216] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/27/19. (CMH)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant Monsanto's motion to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant BASF's motion to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Counts VI, VII, and IX are dismissed. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/10/19. (MRS)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting re: 172 MOTION for Joinder to Monsanto Company's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Continue the Trial Date (Dkt. 170) filed by Defendant BASF Corporation, granting 170 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Continue the Trial Date filed by Defendant Monsanto Company IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the CMO is amended as follows:( Discovery Completion due by 9/4/2019., Jury Trial set for 1/27/2020 09:00 AM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.., Motion in Limine due by 1/17/2020., Pretrial Compliance due by 1/7/2020.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/24/19. (MRS)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 162 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint and Integrated Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Bill Bader, Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc. motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/5/19. (MRS)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 163 Emergency MOTION to Continue March 25, 2019 Expert Deposition Deadline and for Immediate Telephonic Hearing filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. A telephonic hearing was held off the record, and arguments from both sides were heard. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants motion for continuance (#163) is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/21/19. (MRS)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to amend case management order and except case from MDL (#142) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as reflected in the Bader Amended Case Management Order filed today. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to amend case management order filed May 30, 2018 in the individual Bader case, 1:16cv299, (#136) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that, although Bader will remain as part of th e MDL, it will be subject to the Bader Amended Case Management Order filed today, and it is excluded from the procedures outlined in this Court's Order Allowing Master Complaints (#46) to the extent inconsistent with the Bader Amended CMO. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/5/2018. (JMC)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Monsanto's motion (#137) to certify this Court's previous order for interlocutory appeal is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/30/18. (MRS)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Monsanto's motion for partial summary judgment (#105) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' "Motion to Deny Monsanto's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as Premature or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond" (#113) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/8/2018. (JMC)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant BASF's motion to dismiss (#109) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Count VI for fraudulent concealment is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Counts I through V that seek to hold BASF liable for 2015 and 2016 damage are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/13/2018. (JMC)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs Bader Farms, Inc., and Bill Bader's motion to compel (#94) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/20/2017. (JMC)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 87 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Serve Its Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Disclosures on Plaintiff filed by Defendant BASF Corporation - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that BASF's motion for an extension of time to serve its initial disclosures (#87) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/13/2017. (JMC)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 71 MOTION to Quash Deposition Notice and Subpoena of Dr. Ford Baldwin MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Bill Bader, Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc. - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Bader's motion to quash the deposition notice and subpoena of Dr. Ford Baldwin and motion for a protective order (#71) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/24/2017. (JMC)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 68 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Add Party Defendant filed by Plaintiff Bill Bader, Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Bader's motion for leave to file an amended complaint and to add a party defendant (#68) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/20/17. (CSG)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Monsanto Company, 51 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bill Bader, Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc., 52 MOTION to Vacate /Obj ection/Motion for Discovery filed by Plaintiff Bill Bader, Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motions for leave to file an amended complaint (#51) and to vacate order treating defendant's motion to dism iss as a motion for summary judgment and motion for discovery (#52) are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's converted motion for summary judgment (#6) is DENIED as moot.The Court will order a Rule 16 Conference forthwith. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/29/17. (CSG)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: That said, a final ruling on this issue is not appropriate until plaintiffs are given an opportunity to respond further. Pursuant to Rule 12(d), this Court will treat the defendants motion to dismiss as a motion for summary jud gment. The parties are granted an additional 21 days to present any other material that is pertinent to the adequacy of the warning labels including additional briefing on the issue. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/10/2017. (JMC)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 30 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc. - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (#30) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/16/2017. (JMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bader Farms, Inc. et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bader Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Beverly Turina Randles
Represented By: Billy R. Randles
Represented By: Angela Marie Splittgerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Bader
Represented By: Beverly Turina Randles
Represented By: Billy R. Randles
Represented By: Angela Marie Splittgerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Daniel C. Cox
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Masson
Represented By: Jan P. Miller
Represented By: John R. Musgrave
Represented By: Ann E. Sternhell Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?