Hemingway v. McSpadden et al
Plaintiff: |
Lamon Taneal Hemingway, Sr. |
Defendant: |
Branden McSpadden, Unknown Sisk, Unknown Hancock, Brandi Merideth, Jesse May, Hollie Dysinger, Wesley Fluharty, Lucas Lyerla and Bill Stange |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00052 |
Filed: |
April 3, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John M. Bodenhausen |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 7, 2017 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs amended complaint [Doc. #14] is DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint inthis action no later than January 8, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion for an extension of time to file their reply brief [Doc. #19] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for order to show cause [Doc. #17] is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs request for additional time to pay the initial partial filing fee [Doc. #16] is DENIED AS MOOT as the initial partial filing fee was paid on October 23, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to file his second amended complaint by January 8, 2018, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 1/8/2018.). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/7/17. (MRS)
|
September 12, 2017 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Lamon Taneal Hemingway, Sr. motion is GRANTED..IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $ ;1.70 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/12/2017.)IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this ca se will be dismissed without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to file an amended complaint[Doc. #6] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the amended complaint as to defendants McSpadden and Hancock in their individual capacities. Defendants shall be served through the waiver agreement the Court maintains with the Missouri Attorney General 's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. &# 167; 1997e(g)(2), defendants McSpadden and Hancock shall reply to plaintiffs claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue proc ess or cause process to issue upon the amended complaint as to Cory Sisk; Brandi Merideth; Timothy Seabaugh; Paula Reed; Bill Stange; Jason Lewis; Jesse May; Mark Curran; Steve Johnson; Robert Bolin because,as to these defendants, the amended complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5: Prisoner Standard.. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/12/17. (MRS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?