Daniel v. Darter et al
Plaintiff: |
Kevin Dewayne Daniel |
Defendant: |
Nick Darter and Jeff McCormick |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00168 |
Filed: |
September 25, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Dunklin |
Presiding Judge: |
Noelle C. Collins |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 2, 2019 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to reopen his case is GRANTED. [ECF No. 7] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). An Order of D~ssal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Case reopened. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 5/2/2019. (JMC)
|
September 27, 2017 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $1.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Ord er. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittancepayable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an origina l proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are STAYED pending final disposition of the appellate proceedings and post-conviction proceedings against plaintiffrelating to his criminal case of See State v. Daniel, Case No. C ase No.l 7DU-CR00948-01 (35th Judicial Circuit, Dunklin County Court). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall notify the Court in writing concerning the final disposition of the criminal charges pending against him in See State v. Daniel, Case No . l 7DU-CR00948-01 (35th Judicial Circuit, Dunklin County Court). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSEDpending final disposition of the appellate proceedings and post-conviction proceedings related to the criminal charges pe nding against plaintiff in See State v. Daniel, Case No. Case No. l 7DU-CR00948-01 (35th Judicial Circuit, Dunklin County Court). This case may be reopened by plaintiffs filing of a motion to reopen the case after such final disposition. ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/27/2017.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/27/2017. (JMC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?