Woolverton v. City of Wardell et al
Plaintiff: Lee Woolverton
Defendant: Casey Redden, City of Wardell, Tommy Greenwell, Western Surety Company, Edward Holloway and Chris Rudd
Case Number: 1:2017cv00170
Filed: September 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Dunklin
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 163 MOTION for New Trial filed by Plaintiff Lee Woolverton motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 11/10/20. (MRS)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 76 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Casey Redden, Defendant Chris Rudd motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 5/28/20. (MRS)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants City of Wardell, Officer Chris Rudd, and Officer Casey Redden is granted in part and denied in part as follows: The Motion is granted as to the official capacity clai ms against Defendants Rudd and Redden set forth in Count I. The Motion is granted as to the claims against Defendant City of Wardell set forth in Counts III and IV. The Motion is denied as to the individual capacity claims set forth against Defendants Rudd and Redden in Count I.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Deputy EdwardHolloway and Sheriff Tommy Greenwell is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 5/14/18. (MRS)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Western Surety Company Without Prejudice (Doc. 25) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Western Surety Company is dismissed without prejudice from this action. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Count I as to Tommy Greenwell, Only, Without Prejudice (Doc. 29) is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Tommy Greenwells Motion to DismissCount I (Doc. 17) is denied as moot. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motions for More Definite Statement of Defendants Rudd, City of Wardell, Holloway, and Redden (Docs. 14, 26, 31) are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint as to Defendants Greenwell, Rudd, City of Wardell, Holloway, and Redden no later than February 28, 2018 ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 2/28/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 1/29/18. (MRS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woolverton v. City of Wardell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Redden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Greenwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: James S. Kreamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Woolverton
Represented By: Michael A. Moroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?