Brunk v. Conseco Bank, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glenda Brunk
Defendant: Conseco Bank, Inc. and U.S. Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00188
Filed: October 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Reynolds
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 54 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Glenda Brunk: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Glenda Brunk's motion to compel (#54) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 08/14/20. (CMH)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that U.S. Banks motion to dismiss (#15) is DENIED as to Count VI. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/31/19. (CMH)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's "motion asking the court to calculate the damages in her default judgment against Conseco Bank, Inc." (#37) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/9/2019. (JMC)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 29 PRO SE MOTION Emergency Motion Seeking Court Order For U.S. Bank to Produce The Original Note filed by Plaintiff Glenda Brunk. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's "Emergency Motion Seeking Court Order for U.S. Bank to Produce the Original Note" (#29) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/19/18. (CSG)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Upon review of the file, the Court notes that there has been no activity on behalf of defendant Conseco Bank Inc. since the filing of the return of proof of service upon defendant Conseco Bank Inc. on November 6, 2017. IT IS HE REBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without prejudice. Response to Court due by 7/9/2018. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/25/18. (CSG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brunk v. Conseco Bank, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Brunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conseco Bank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Anna-Katrina Saranti Christakis
Represented By: Jennifer L. Majewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?