Benford v. Dunklin County et al

Plaintiff: Terry Lewis Benford
Defendant: Dunklin County, Nichole Green, Ashley Grisham, Gina Whitlock and Unknown Pewhitt
Case Number: 1:2018cv00005
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Dunklin
Presiding Judge: John M. Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Dr. Charles Pewitt and Ashley Grisham's Motion to Dismiss for Failure of Plaintiff to Comply with Court Order (ECF No. 30) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plainti ffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel to Represent under 42 U.S.C. [§] 1983 and Request for Delay of Case Management Order Track 5 Disclosures of Documents by Plaintiff and Discovery of Defendants (ECF No. 32) is denied without prejudice as to his request for appointment of counsel and granted as to his request for delay. No later than December 20, 2018, Plaintiff shall submit to Defendants a list, including addresses, of all persons having knowledge or information of the facts giving ris e to his claim and all documents that Plaintiff believes mention, relate to, or in any way support his claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's "Request of Discovery of all Medical and Grievances Records from Dunklin County Jail" is DENIED inasmuch as Plaintiff is not entitled to all of Dunklin County Jail's medical and grievance records or individual files of other prisoners who are not parties to this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that erring on the side of caution, D efendants shall provide copies of Plaintiff's medical and grievance records from Dunklin County Jail during the relevant time period related to Plaintiff's claims in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall answer the complaint no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. ( Response to Court due by 12/4/2018.). Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 11/20/2018. (JMC)
July 18, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Ashley Grisham, Defendant Charles Pewitt. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by defendants A shley Grisham and Charles Pewitt is GRANTED to the extent Grisham seeks dismissal of plaintiff's claim that she violated his constitutional rights by failing to send him for an outside medicalconsultation, and is DENIED in all other respects. A separate order of partial dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Ashley Grisham and Charles Pewitt shall answer the complaint no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 7/18/18. (CSG)
April 25, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Terry Lewis Benford. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) is GRANTED. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $3.78 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to incl ude upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) the statement that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Dunklin County and Nicole Green are DISMISSED from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the official capacity claims against defendants Ashley Grisham, Gina Whitlock and Dr. Charles Pewitt are DISMISSED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process, or cause process to issue, upon defendants Ashley Grisham, Gina Whitlock, and Dr. Charles Pewitt. The defendants shall be served by issuance of summons and service by the U.S. Marshal's Office at the Dunklin County Justice Center, 1175 Floyd Street, Kennett, MO 63857. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 5/25/2018.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 4/25/18. (CSG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benford v. Dunklin County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lewis Benford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunklin County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Grisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pewhitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?